EP1901623 - AGGLUTINANT COMPOUND AND AGGLUTINATED PRODUCT FOR RECONSTITUTING POWDERS OF VEGETAL ORIGIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ioto International Indústria e Comércio de Produtos aromáticos Ltda Estrada Do Cerne (pr-90), 20.088 83535-000 Campo Magro / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Ioto International Indústria e Comércio de Produtos aromáticos Ltda Estrada Do Cerne (pr-90), 20.088 83535-000 Campo Magro / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORRENS, Gilson Luiz Rua Carlos Benato, 683 82320-440 Curitiba / BR | 02 /
IODICE, Bianca Alameda D. Pedro II, 571 Apt.101A - Batel 80420-060 Curitiba, Parana / BR | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/14] | 01 /
TORRENS, Gilson Luiz Rua Carlos Benato, 683 82320-440 Curitiba / BR | ||
02 /
IODICE, Bianca Rua Jacarezinho, 920, Ap. 41 80810-130 Curitiba / BR | |||
Former [2008/13] | 01 /
IODICE, Bianca Rua Carlos Benato, 683 82320-440 Curitiba / BR | ||
02 /
TORRENS, Gilson Luiz Rua Jacarezinho, 920, Ap. 41 80810-130 Curitiba / BR | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | ||
Former [2008/13] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 06780024.3 | 07.07.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006IB52316 | Priority number, date | BR2005PI02935 | 08.07.2005 Original published format: BR PI0502935 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007007269 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1901623 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1901623 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/14 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A23F3/34 (EP,US);
A23F3/14 (EP,US);
A23F5/12 (EP,US);
A23L27/10 (EP,US);
A23L27/74 (EP,US);
A24B15/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENKLEBENDE VERBINDUNG UND ZUSAMMENKLEBENDES PRODUKT ZUR REKONSTITUTION VON PULVERN PFLANZLICHEN URSPRUNGS | [2008/13] | English: | AGGLUTINANT COMPOUND AND AGGLUTINATED PRODUCT FOR RECONSTITUTING POWDERS OF VEGETAL ORIGIN | [2008/13] | French: | COMPOSE AGGLUTINANT ET PRODUIT AGGLUTINE SERVANT A LA RECONSTITUTION DE POUDRES D'ORIGINE VEGETALE | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2006 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004339454 ; | [XY]JP2004107413 ; | [X]JP2004182772 ; | [Y]EP0056308 (PHILIP MORRIS INC [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 5, line 6 - line 20; claims 1,7 *; | [A]JPS61257143 (AKIYAMA MINORU) [A] 1,3,5,7,15,16* abstract *; | [X]WO0234857 (METABOLIX INC [US]) [X] 1,3,10,12 * page 8, line 13 - line 18 * * page 33, line 3 - line 13 *; | [A]WO03055337 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 03, Database accession no. 2005-023331, XP002425235 & JP2004339454 A 20041202 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1-3,15,16 * abstract * | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 43, Database accession no. 2004-453385, XP002425236 & JP2004107413 A 20040408 (MITSUI CHEM INC) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * [Y] 1-16 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 56, Database accession no. 2004-573432, XP002425237 & JP2004182772 A 20040702 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | EP0238298 | WO9929190 | DE19949983 | by applicant | EP0056308 |