15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
26.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
24.01.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
12.04.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
15.02.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
14.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
12.09.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
16.02.2012 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.01.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.12.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2009 |
First examination report |
|
23.09.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.07.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
18.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
25.04.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
14.03.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
14.03.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
12.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|