EP1903008 - METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF WATER CONTAINING HARDLY-DEGRADABLE SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAMOTO, Takahisa 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990293 / JP | 02 /
MORIMITSU, Kozo 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990293 / JP | 03 /
MACHIDA, Masashi 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990293 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIOKA, Yoshiyuki 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990293 / JP | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06780680.2 | 30.06.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006JP313113 | Priority number, date | JP20050206109 | 14.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005206109 | [2008/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007569 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903008 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/28, B01D61/02, B01D61/04, B01D61/16, B01D65/02, C02F1/32, C02F1/44, C02F1/72 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B01D61/16 (EP,US);
C02F1/28 (EP,KR);
B01D61/02 (KR);
B01D61/025 (EP,US);
B01D61/027 (EP,US);
B01D61/04 (KR);
B01D61/145 (EP,US);
B01D61/58 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (EP,KR,US);
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,US);
B01D2317/025 (EP,US);
B01D2317/08 (EP,US);
B01D2321/04 (EP,US);
B01D61/147 (EP,US);
C02F1/281 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/44 (EP);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C02F1/70 (EP,US);
C02F1/72 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/2626 (US,EP);
C02F9/00, C02F1/28, C02F1/44, C02F1/72 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/35] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER WASSERHALTIGEN SCHWER ABBAUBAREN SUBSTANZ | [2008/13] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF WATER CONTAINING HARDLY-DEGRADABLE SUBSTANCE | [2008/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE L EAU CONTENANT UNE SUBSTANCE FAIBLEMENT DÉGRADABLE | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2008 | Translation filed | 06.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 15.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5122165 (WANG LAWRENCE K [US], et al) [A] 7,16* the whole document *; | [YA]US5362395 (DORAU WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [Y] 16 * the whole document * [A] 6,8; | [YA]EP0671363 (NEC ENVIRONMENT ENG LTD [JP]) [Y] 7,16 * the whole document * [A] 8; | [A]WO0226640 (MICROBAR SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 16 * page 6, lines 12-15,30,31 *; | [XY]JP2003266090 (MAEZAWA KOGYO) [X] 1,2,4,9-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0020]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 7,16; | [X]JP2004261631 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1-5,9,10,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1707538 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) [E] 1,2,4-6,8-15 * the whole document * |