EP1902663 - APPARATUS FOR PLACING CAPSULE TYPE MEDICAL DEVICE, APPARATUS FOR PLACING CAPSULE ENDOSCOPE IN THE BODY AND CAPSULE TYPE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR PLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKIZAWA, Hironobu, c/o OLYMPUS MED. SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Shinsuke c/o OLYMPUS MED. SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 03 /
HIRAKAWA, Katsumi c/o OLYMPUS MED. SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 04 /
UCHIYAMA, Akio c/o OLYMPUS MED. SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 05 /
YOKOI, Takeshi c/o OLYMPUS MED. SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06780838.6 | 06.07.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006JP313512 | Priority number, date | JP20050200886 | 08.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005200886 | JP20050209089 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005209089 | [2008/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007648 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902663 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B5/07, A61B1/07 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B1/00147 (EP,US);
A61B1/00148 (EP,US);
A61B5/065 (EP,US);
A61B5/07 (EP,US);
A61B5/6882 (EP,US);
A61B1/00016 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/13] | A61B1/00, A61B5/07 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/32] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR PLATZIERUNG EINES MEDIZINPRODUKTS VOM KAPSELTYP, GERÄT ZUR PLATZIERUNG EINES KAPSELENDOSKOPS IM KÖRPER UND MEDIZINPRODUKT VOM KAPSELTYP ZUR PLATZIERUNG | [2008/13] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PLACING CAPSULE TYPE MEDICAL DEVICE, APPARATUS FOR PLACING CAPSULE ENDOSCOPE IN THE BODY AND CAPSULE TYPE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR PLACEMENT | [2008/13] | French: | APPAREIL DESTINÉ À POSITIONNER UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL DE TYPE CAPSULE, APPAREIL DESTINÉ À POSITIONNER UN ENDOSCOPE DE TYPE CAPSULE DANS LE CORPS ET DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL DE TYPE CAPSULE À POSITIONNER | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2007 | Translation filed | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 09.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002042562 (MERON GAVRIEL [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,14,16-19,21,23,26-30,32-38,41-49,51,55-56,60 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] , [0032] , [0037] , [0039] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 11-13,22; | [XI]US2003181794 (RINI CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 1,20,23,44,46-49,53,55-56,58,60 * paragraphs [0076] , [0095] , [0104] , [0011] , [0117] * * figures 16-18,22-24,31,31 * [I] 11-13; | [XI]WO2004058041 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-10,14-17,21,23-36,42-52,55,57-58 * page 6, lines 1-2; figures 1A-2C * [I] 11-13,22,39-40,54,59,61-62; | [X]US2004260164 (KILCOYNE JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 1,17-19,23,44-45,47,52 * figures 4-7,13,14,16-22E *; | [X]US2005038370 (KUTH RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,23-25,33,42-45,52,56* figures 1A-4C *; | [X]WO2005053517 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,14,17-18,21,23-30,32,34,38,41-49,51,55-56,60 * paragraph [0008]; figures 1-5,8,9,22,23,25-28,33,36 * |