EP1906215 - FOAMED RESIN SHEET AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMATSUBARA, Shigemaru c/o Teijin Chemicals Ltd. 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1000011 / JP | 02 /
HORIGUCHI, Toru c/o Teijin Chemicals Ltd. 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1000011 / JP | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06781081.2 | 07.07.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006JP314006 | Priority number, date | JP20050205249 | 14.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005205249 | JP20050235855 | 16.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005235855 | JP20050235856 | 16.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005235856 | [2008/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007852 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1906215 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/02, G02B5/08, G02F1/13357 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
G02B5/0284 (EP,US);
G02B5/08 (KR);
F21V7/24 (EP,US);
F21V7/28 (EP,US);
G02B5/0247 (EP,US);
G02B5/0278 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/133606 (EP,US);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/0051 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | SCHAUMHARZBLATT UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE | [2008/14] | English: | FOAMED RESIN SHEET AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY | [2008/14] | French: | FEUILLE DE RÉSINE MOUSSÉE ET ÉCRAN À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2008 | Translation filed | 14.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 24.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 08.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2005115051 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [I] 1-19 * abstract *; | US2007054110 [ ] (KAWATO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [ ] * pages 3,6,7 *; | [A]JP2005055883 (OJI PAPER CO) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [I]JP2002116306 (KEIWA INC) [I] 1-19 * abstract *; | [I]GB2397160 (DAER LIGHTING LTD [GB]) [I] 1-19 * abstract *; | [I]JPH11268157 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [I] 1-19 * abstract * |