EP1908466 - SUBSTITUTED PROPANAMIDE DERIVATIVE AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited 3-5-1, Nihombashi-honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Kazumasa c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Ltd. 1-2-58, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 02 /
SUDA, Koji c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Ltd. 1-2-58, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 03 /
GOTANDA, Kentoku c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Ltd. 1-2-58, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 04 /
KIMURA, Tomio c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Ltd. 1-2-58, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | [2014/08] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
AOKI, Kazumasa c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Ltd. 1-2-58, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | ||
02 /
SUDA, Koji c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Ltd. 1-2-58, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | |||
03 /
GOTANDA, Kentoku c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Ltd. 1-2-58, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | |||
04 /
KIMURA, Tomio c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Ltd. 1-2-58, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | Representative(s) | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/15] | Gibson, Christian John Robert, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06781166.1 | 18.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006JP314144 | Priority number, date | JP20050208036 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005208036 | [2008/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010885 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908466 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908466 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/167, A61P19/08, A61P19/10, A61P35/04, C07C237/22, A61K31/166 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
C07C237/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07C233/30 (KR);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | A61K31/167, A61P19/08, A61P19/10, A61P35/04, C07C237/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTES PROPANAMID-DERIVAT UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE DIESES ENTHÄLT | [2013/37] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PROPANAMIDE DERIVATIVE AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME | [2008/15] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'UNE PROPANAMIDE SUBSTITUÉE ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CONTENANT CELUI-CI | [2013/37] |
Former [2008/15] | SUBSTITUIERTES PROPANAMID-DERIVAT UND DIESES ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [2008/15] | DÉRIVÉ DE PROPANAMIDE SUBSTITUÉ ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CONTENANT CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2008 | Translation filed | 17.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 29.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2006 | AT | 19.02.2014 | BE | 19.02.2014 | BG | 19.02.2014 | CY | 19.02.2014 | CZ | 19.02.2014 | DK | 19.02.2014 | EE | 19.02.2014 | ES | 19.02.2014 | FI | 19.02.2014 | IT | 19.02.2014 | LT | 19.02.2014 | LV | 19.02.2014 | MC | 19.02.2014 | NL | 19.02.2014 | PL | 19.02.2014 | RO | 19.02.2014 | SE | 19.02.2014 | SI | 19.02.2014 | SK | 19.02.2014 | TR | 19.02.2014 | GR | 20.05.2014 | IS | 19.06.2014 | PT | 19.06.2014 | IE | 18.07.2014 | LU | 18.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.07.2006 | |
AT | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.02.2014 | |
IS | 19.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2503992 (ROTTA RESEARCH LAB) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,17,18,31,32,36-40,45,48 * 57227-84-6; 57227-86-8; 57227-90-4; 57228-04-3; 57228-07-6; 57228-09-8; 57228-10-1; *; | [X]EP0217286 (OKAMOTO SHOSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,16-18,31-33,36-40,45,48 * compound PASI 535 * * 109359-82-2; 109359-83-3; 109360-03-4; 109360-04-5 *; | [X]WO9834115 (TREGA BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 17-19,27,28,31,32 * table 2 *; | [A]WO0039077 (KAROBIO AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-48 * pages 16-17; compounds 5, 16, 24 *; | [A]WO2005061440 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-48* the whole document *; | [X] - VIEWEG, H. ET AL, "Synthesis of N.alpha.-(4-methylbenzoyl)-4-amidinophenylalaninamides and ester", PHARMAZIE , 38(3), 170-1 CODEN: PHARAT; ISSN: 0031-7144, (1983), XP001526171 [X] 17,18,31,32 * compound 6 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19841116), Database accession no. 57227-85-7, URL: STN, XP002672779 [X] 17,18,31,32 * the whole document * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19841116), Database accession no. 57227-83-5, URL: STN, XP002672780 [X] 17,18,31,32 * the whole document * | [A] - N. KATUNUMA ET AL, "Structure-Based Development of Pyridoxal Propionate Derivatives as Specific Inhibitors of Cathepsin K in Vitro and in Vivo", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (20000101), vol. 267, no. 3, doi:10.1006/bbrc.1999.1953, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 850 - 854, XP055023518 [A] 1-48 * compound CLICK 162 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.1953 |