EP1908783 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SUGAR CHAIN DERIVATIVE, STRUCTURE ANALYSIS METHOD, AND SUGAR CHAIN DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glytech, Inc. 134 Chudoji-minamimachi Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8813 / JP | [2013/32] |
Former [2009/43] | For all designated states Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0021 / JP | ||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-27, Otedori 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-0021 / JP | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Otsuka Chemical Holdings Co., Ltd. 2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAKEHI, Kazuaki 1-1226, Horen-cho kita Nara-shi, Nara 630-8113 / JP | 02 /
KINOSHITA, Mitsuhiro 2-51, Hanaten nishi 1-chome Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-0011 / JP | 03 /
MATSUNO, Yuki 23-24,3-chome Namiki Tsukuba-Shi Ibaraki 305-0044 / JP | [2016/23] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
KAKEHI, Kazuaki 1-1226, Horen-cho kita Nara-shi, Nara 6308113 / JP | ||
02 /
KINOSHITA, Mitsuhiro 2-51, Hanten nishi 1-chome, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5360011 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUNO, Yuki 23-24,3-chome Namiki Tsukuba-Shi Ibaraki 305-0044 / JP | |||
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
KAKEHI, Kazuaki 1-1226, Horen-cho kita Nara-shi, Nara 6308113 / JP | ||
02 /
KINOSHITA, Mitsuhiro 2-51, Hanten nishi 1-chome, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5360011 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUNO, Yuki 8-29, Wakaehonmachi 4-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 5780942 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06781624.9 | 19.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006JP314712 | Priority number, date | JP20050209077 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005209077 | [2008/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007011055 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908783 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908783 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07H3/06, G01N30/84, C08B37/00, G01N30/72 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C07H3/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08B37/00 (KR);
G01N30/72 (US);
C08B37/006 (EP,US);
G01N30/84 (EP,US);
G01N30/88 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | C08B37/00, C07H3/06, G01N30/88 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZUCKERKETTENDERIVATS, STRUKTURANALYSENMETHODE UND ZUCKERKETTENDERIVAT | [2008/15] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SUGAR CHAIN DERIVATIVE, STRUCTURE ANALYSIS METHOD, AND SUGAR CHAIN DERIVATIVE | [2008/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN DÉRIVÉ DE CHAINE SACCHARIDIQUE, PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE STRUCTURE, ET DÉRIVÉ DE CHAINE SACCHARIDIQUE | [2016/01] |
Former [2008/15] | PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE DERIVE DE CHAINE DE SUCRE, PROCEDE D'ANALYSE DE STRUCTURE, ET DERIVE DE CHAINE DE SUCRE | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2008 | Translation filed | 13.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2006 | AT | 08.06.2016 | BE | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | ES | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | IE | 19.07.2016 | LU | 19.07.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.07.2006 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.07.2006 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - OTAKE Y ET AL, "ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF AN N-LINKED OLIGOSACCHARIDE THAT IS SIGNIFICANTLY INCREASED IN SERA FROM PATIENTS WITH NON-SMALL CELL LUNG CANCER", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPANESE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY / OUP, TOKYO, JP, (20010101), vol. 129, no. 4, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 537 - 542, XP002944725 [Y] 10-13 * the whole document * | [Y] - EL RASSI, ZIAD ET AL., "High-Performance Liquid Chromatography of Sialooligosaccharides and Gangliosides", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1989), vol. 488, pages 229 - 236, XP002550562 [Y] 10-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(00)82948-5 | [A] - BIGGE J C ET AL, "Nonselective and efficient fluorescent labelling of glycans using 2-amino benzamide and anthranilic acid", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, (19950101), vol. 230, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 229 - 238, XP002489980 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1995.1468 | [A] - NAKAGAWA H ET AL, "Identification of Neutral and Sialyl N-Linked Oligosaccharide Structures from Human Serum Glycoproteins Using Three Kinds of High-Performance Liquid Chromatography", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, (19950301), vol. 226, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 130 - 138, XP002484580 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1995.1200 | [A] - FUJIMOTO I ET AL, "Systematic Analysis of N-Linked Sugar Chains from Whole Tissue Employing Partial Automation", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, (19990215), vol. 267, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 336 - 343, XP002993791 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1998.2968 |