EP1925225 - SLIDER FOR HIDDEN SLIDE FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 8642 / JP | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEYAKI, Keiichi c/o YKK Corporation Kurobe. 200, Yoshida Kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 02 /
IWASE, Yuichi c/o YKK Corporation Kurobe 200, Yoshida Kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06782179.3 | 02.08.2006 | [2008/22] | WO2006JP315310 | Priority number, date | JP20050241433 | 23.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005241433 | [2008/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007023652 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925225 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/26 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
A44B19/26 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2561 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | IT [2008/38] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEBER FÜR VERSTECKTEN REISSVERSCHLUSS | [2008/22] | English: | SLIDER FOR HIDDEN SLIDE FASTENER | [2008/22] | French: | CURSEUR POUR FERMETURE À GLISSIÈRE CAMOUFLÉE | [2008/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2008 | Translation filed | 17.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 24.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.09.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |