EP1911665 - SPROCKET FOR CORELESS CRAWLER TRACK AND STRUCTURE FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUO, Shuichi c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06782347.6 | 04.08.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006JP315489 | Priority number, date | JP20050226557 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005226557 | [2008/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007015558 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911665 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1911665 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/12 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
B62D55/12 (EP,US);
B62D55/244 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/36] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KETTENRAD FÜR KERNLOSE GLEISKETTE UND STRUKTUR DAFÜR | [2008/17] | English: | SPROCKET FOR CORELESS CRAWLER TRACK AND STRUCTURE FOR THE SAME | [2008/16] | French: | ROUE DENTÉE DESTINÉE À UNE CHENILLE ET SA STRUCTURE | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/16] | KETTENRAD FÜR KERNLOSE GLEISKETTE UNDSTRUKTUR DAFÜR | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2008 | Translation filed | 08.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 05.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6000766 (TAKEUCHI MASASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6* column 3, line 19 - column 5, line 30; figures 1,6b *; | [Y]EP1273504 (OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,6 * column 8, paragraph 58 - column 9, paragraph 72; figures 1-4 * |