EP1925701 - SPONGE-LIKE STRUCTURAL BODY AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/22] | SPONGE-LIKE STRUCTURAL BODY OR POWDER, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2010/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARUSE, Yoshihiro 10-A7-42, Sonoyama 2-chome, Otsu-shi Shiga, 5200842 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Satoshi 1-31-17, Tsu-nishi, Kamakura-shi Kanagawa, 2480034 / JP | 03 /
NONAKA, Shuichi 10-B2-24, Sonoyama 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0842 / JP | 04 /
MIWA, Keishi 15-11, Tamagawa 4-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 1580094 / JP | 05 /
MURAKAMI, Kakuji 1-54, Nakazawa 3-chome Ritto-shi, Shiga 520-3025 / JP | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06782411.0 | 07.08.2006 | [2008/22] | WO2006JP315569 | Priority number, date | JP20050231679 | 10.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005231679 | JP20050238325 | 19.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005238325 | [2008/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018165 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925701 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925701 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/70, D04H1/42, A61K8/72, A61Q19/00, D21H13/00, D21H15/00, F26B3/12, F26B5/06 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
A61K8/02 (EP,US);
D04H1/732 (KR);
C08J9/36 (US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/72 (KR);
A61Q1/12 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/28 (US);
D04H1/42 (KR);
D21H13/10 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
C08J2323/12 (US);
C08J2367/03 (US);
C08J2377/02 (US);
C08J2381/04 (US);
Y10T428/298 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/22] | D04H1/70, D04H1/42, A61K8/72, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÖRPER MIT SCHWAMMARTIGEM AUFBAU SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/44] | English: | SPONGE-LIKE STRUCTURAL BODY AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2010/44] | French: | CORPS SPONGIEUX, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2010/44] |
Former [2008/22] | KÖRPER ODER PULVER MIT SCHWAMMARTIGEM AUFBAU SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2008/22] | SPONGE-LIKE STRUCTURAL BODY OR POWDER, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2008/22] | CORPS OU POUDRE STRUCTUREL(LE) SPONGIEUSE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2008 | Translation filed | 28.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 23.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2011 | BE | 27.07.2011 | CY | 27.07.2011 | CZ | 27.07.2011 | DK | 27.07.2011 | EE | 27.07.2011 | FI | 27.07.2011 | HU | 27.07.2011 | IT | 27.07.2011 | LT | 27.07.2011 | LV | 27.07.2011 | NL | 27.07.2011 | PL | 27.07.2011 | RO | 27.07.2011 | SE | 27.07.2011 | SI | 27.07.2011 | SK | 27.07.2011 | TR | 27.07.2011 | IE | 07.08.2011 | LU | 07.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 27.10.2011 | GR | 28.10.2011 | ES | 07.11.2011 | IS | 27.11.2011 | PT | 28.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
TR | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 27.07.2011 | |
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0042253 (AVICON INC [US]) [A] 1,9,13* claim 1 *; | [X]JPH09263857 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [X] 1,13,17 * abstract; paragraph [0016] *; | [X]US2003165740 (EDWARDS STEPHEN JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,7 *; | [X]US2005095695 (SCHINDLER MELVIN S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,11-12 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] - [0013] - [0036] - [0037] - [0040] , [0098]; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2005040495 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * examples 1,15; claims 1,3; table 1 * |