04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
01.06.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
30.03.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
17.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
10.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
03.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
27.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
20.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
24.06.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
01.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.10.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
12.10.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.10.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
01.10.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
01.10.2010 |
Change - German title |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
01.10.2010 |
Change - English title |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
01.10.2010 |
Change - French title |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
31.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.07.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.03.2010 |
First examination report |
|
19.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.10.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
24.07.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
02.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
25.04.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
11.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|