EP1914457 - FLUID CONTROLLER WITH JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikin Incorporated 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states FUJIKIN INCORPORATED 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATA, Tomihiro c/o FUJIKIN INCORPORATED 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5500012 / JP | 02 /
YAMAJI, Michio c/o FUJIKIN INCORPORATED 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5500012 / JP | 03 /
HARADA, Akihiro c/o FUJIKIN INCORPORATED Itachibori 2-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5500012 / JP | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwaltssozietät Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 06782530.7 | 09.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006JP315714 | Priority number, date | JP20050231564 | 10.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005231564 | [2008/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018228 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1914457 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16K27/00, F16L19/02, F17C13/00, F17C13/04 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
F16L19/025 (EP,US);
F17C13/00 (KR);
F16K27/00 (KR);
F16K27/003 (EP,US);
F16L19/02 (KR);
F17C13/04 (KR);
F17C2205/0352 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2008/36] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDSTEUERUNG MIT VERBINDUNG | [2008/17] | English: | FLUID CONTROLLER WITH JOINT | [2008/17] | French: | RÉGULATEUR DE FLUIDE AVEC JOINT | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2008 | Translation filed | 11.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 11.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |