EP1917282 - REPELLENT COMPOSITION CONTAINING GRAFT COPOLYMER, GRAFT COPOLYMER AND METHOD OF PREPARING GRAFT COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2010/49] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKER, Anthony, A. c/o Polymer Synergies, LLC, 550 Bridgeton Pike, Su ite 13 Mantua, New Jersey 08051 / US | 02 /
MARCINKO, Joseph, J. c/o Polymer Synergies, LLC, 550 Bridgeton Pike, Su ite 13 Mantua, New Jersey 08051 / US | 03 /
ADAMSKY, Franklin, A. c/o Daikin America, Inc., 905 State Docks Road Decatur, Alabama;35601 / US | 04 /
HARTONG, Bradley, H. c/o Daikin America, Inc., 905 State Docks Road Decatur, Alabama 35601 / US | 05 /
ENOMOTO, Takashi c/o Yodogawa Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., 1-1 , Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06782676.8 | 04.08.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006JP315890 | Priority number, date | US20050705499P | 05.08.2005 Original published format: US 705499 P | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018276 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1917282 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1917282 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1917282 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F261/04, C08F291/08, D06M15/277 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
D06M15/277 (EP,KR,US);
C08F261/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08F251/00 (EP,US);
C08F251/02 (EP,US);
C08F259/08 (KR);
C08F263/04 (EP,US);
C08F289/00 (EP,US);
C08F291/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C08L51/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23986 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2172 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F261/04, C08F220/24 (EP,US);
C08F291/08, C08F220/24 (US,EP);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFROPFCOPOLYMER ENTHALTENDE ABWEISENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, PFROPFCOPOLYMER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/19] | English: | REPELLENT COMPOSITION CONTAINING GRAFT COPOLYMER, GRAFT COPOLYMER AND METHOD OF PREPARING GRAFT COPOLYMER | [2008/19] | French: | COMPOSITION REPULSIVE CONTENANT UN COPOLYMERE GREFFE, COPOLYMERE GREFFE, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN COPOLYMERE GREFFE | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2010 | BE | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | LT | 03.11.2010 | LV | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | PL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | IS | 03.03.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 03.11.2010 |