EP1927583 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF DIALKYL CARBONATE AND DIOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | [2012/17] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8440 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAJI, Hironori 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8440 / JP | 02 /
FUKUOKA, Shinsuke 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8440 / JP | 03 /
HACHIYA, Hiroshi 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8440 / JP | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2012/18] |
Former [2008/23] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06783181.8 | 05.09.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006JP317492 | Priority number, date | JP20050272557 | 20.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005272557 | [2008/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007034669 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927583 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927583 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C27/02, C07C29/128, C07C31/20, C07C68/06, C07C69/96 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
C07C68/065 (EP,US);
C07C27/28 (KR);
C07C29/80 (KR);
C07C31/20 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C68/065, C07C69/96 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIALKYLCARBONAT UND DIOL | [2008/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF DIALKYL CARBONATE AND DIOL | [2008/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CARBONATE DE DIALKYLE ET DE DIOL | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2008 | Translation filed | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2006 | AT | 02.05.2012 | BE | 02.05.2012 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | GB | 05.09.2012 | IE | 05.09.2012 | LU | 05.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
LU | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |