EP2035443 - STABILIZED VITAMIN C DERIVATIVES HAVING A PEPTIDE MOLECULE, PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peptron Co., Ltd. 385-19 Doryong-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-340 Daejeon / KR | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jong-Il 108-206 Sejong Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Heung-Jae 102-508 Hansol Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-803 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dong-Won 304 Henning Pennsylvania State University University Park, PA 16802 / US | 04 /
LIM, Chae-Jin 102-102 Mokryun Apt. Sangdae-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-313 / KR | 05 /
KANG, Jong-Phil 401, 305-4 Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | 06 /
PARK, Kyeong-Yong 3-107 Mok-dong Joong-gu Daejeon 301-070 / KR | 07 /
YOON, Seok-Jeong 108-706, Cheonggu Narae Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-729 / KR | 08 /
KWON, Seon-Deok A-302, 119-12 Daesa-dong Joong-gu Daejeon 301-040 / KR | 09 /
CHOI, Ho-Il 107-1303 Hanwool Apt. Shinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | [2017/13] |
Former [2009/42] | 01 /
PARK, Jong-Il 108-206 Sejong Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Heung-Jae 102-508 Hansol Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-803 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Dong-Won 304 Henning Pennsylvania State University University Park, PA 16802 / US | |||
04 /
LIM, Chae-Jin 102-102 Mokryun Apt. Sangdae-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-313 / KR | |||
05 /
KANG, Jong-Phil 401, 305-4 Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | |||
06 /
PARK, Kyeong-Yong 3-107 Mok-dong Joong-gu Daejeon 301-070 / KR | |||
07 /
YOON, Seok-Jeong 108-706, Cheonggu Narae Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-729 / KR | |||
08 /
KWON, Seon-Deok A-302, 119-12 Daesa-dong Joong-gu Daejeon 301-040 / KR | |||
09 /
CHOI, Ho-Il 107-1303 Hanwool Apt. Shinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | |||
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
PARK, Jong-Il 108-206 Sejong Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Heung-Jae 102-508 Hansol Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-803 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Dong-Won Pepper Mill 710 South Atherton State College, PA 16801 / US | |||
04 /
LIM, Chae-Jin 102-102 Mokryun Apt. Sangdae-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-313 / KR | |||
05 /
KANG, Jong-Phil 401, 305-4 Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | |||
06 /
PARK, Kyeong-Yong 3-107 Mok-dong Joong-gu Daejeon 301-070 / KR | |||
07 /
YOON, Seok-Jeong 108-706, Cheonggu Narae Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-729 / KR | |||
08 /
KWON, Seon-Deok A-302, 119-12 Daesa-dong Joong-gu Daejeon 301-040 / KR | |||
09 /
CHOI, Ho-Il 107-1303 Hanwool Apt. Shinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | |||
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
PARK, Jong-Il 108-206 Sejong Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Heung-Jae 102-508 Hansol Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-803 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Dong-Won 401, 292-3 Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | |||
04 /
LIM, Chae-Jin 102-102 Mokryun Apt. Sangdae-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-313 / KR | |||
05 /
KANG, Jong-Phil 401, 305-4 Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | |||
06 /
PARK, Kyeong-Yong 3-107 Mok-dong Joong-gu Daejeon 301-070 / KR | |||
07 /
YOON, Seok-Jeong 202, 144-2 Shinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | |||
08 /
KWON, Seon-Deok A-302, 119-12 Daesa-dong Joong-gu Daejeon 301-040 / KR | |||
09 /
CHOI, Ho-Il 107-1303 Hanwool Apt. Shinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | Representative(s) | Nemec, Harald, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2017/13] |
Former [2009/12] | Nemec, Harald, et al Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06783775.7 | 05.09.2006 | [2009/12] | WO2006KR03520 | Priority number, date | KR20060056580 | 22.06.2006 Original published format: KR 20060056580 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007148847 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2035443 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2035443 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 27.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/04, C07K7/04, C07D307/62, A61K8/67, C07K5/08, C07K7/06, A61Q19/08 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
C07K5/0827 (EP,US);
C07D307/62 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/676 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
C07F9/09 (KR);
C07K19/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2009/12] | C07K5/04, C07K7/04, C07D307/62, A61K8/67 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE VITAMIN-C-DERIVATE MIT EINEM PEPTIDMOLEKÜL, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE DIESE ENTHÄLT | [2009/12] | English: | STABILIZED VITAMIN C DERIVATIVES HAVING A PEPTIDE MOLECULE, PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME | [2009/12] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE VITAMINE C STABILISÉS COMPORTANT UNE MOLÉCULE DE PEPTIDE, LEUR MÉTHODE DE SYNTHÈSE ET UNE COMPOSITION LES INCLUANT | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 13.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2006 | AT | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | IT | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | NL | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | IE | 05.09.2017 | LU | 05.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.09.2006 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.09.2006 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03139288 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB, et al) [A] 1-17* abstract *; | [Y]EP0875514 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [Y] 1-10,12-17 * page 6, line 9 - line 12; examples 5, 6; claims 1-10; tables 1, 2 * * page 2, line 17 - line 22 *; | [Y]WO2004096837 (CHOI HO IL [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10,12-17 * formulas 1a and 1b;; page 27, line 4 - line 8; claims 1-13; tables 1, 2 * | International search | [A]WO2004096837 (CHOI HO IL [KR], et al); | [A]WO2005034903 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al); | [A]FR2855047 (OREAL [FR]) | by applicant | KR20060056580 | US4983382 | US5409693 | KR100459679B | FR2668265 | US4665054 | WO9103488 | WO9107431 | - DARR, D. ET AL., ACTA DERM. VENEREOL. (STRCKH)., (1996), vol. 76, pages 264 - 268 | - BLACK, H. S. ET AL., J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1975), vol. 65, pages 412 - 414 | - DARR, D. ET AL., BRIT. J. DERMATIL., (1992), vol. 127, pages 247 - 253 | - MURRY, J. ET AL., J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1991), vol. 96, page 587 | - BUETTNER, G. R. ET AL., Handbook of antioxidants., (1996), pages 91 - 115 | - TOMITA, Y. ET AL., J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1980), vol. 75, no. 5, pages 379 - 382 | - TOMITA, Y. ET AL., J. INVSET. DERMATOL., (1980), vol. 75, no. 5, pages 379 - 382 | - NAKAMURA, T. ET AL., J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1997), vol. 109, pages 20 - 24 | - BISSETT, D. ET AL., PHOTODERMATOL PHOTOIMMUNOL PHOTOMED, (1990), vol. 7, pages 56 - 62 | - PINNELL, S. R. ET AL., DERMATOLOGIC SURGERY., (2001), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 137 - 142 | - SHUSTER S., BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (1975), vol. 93, no. 6, pages 639 - 643 | - KOU KATAYAMA ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, pages 7097 - 7104 | - KOU KATAYAMA ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 268, no. 14, pages 9941 - 9944 | - MOSSMAN T., JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1983), vol. 65, pages 55 - 63 |