EP1919599 - PROCESS FOR OBTAINING A POROUS MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/20] | POROUS MEMBRANE AND RECORDING MEDIUM COMPRISING SAME | ||
[2012/35] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Manufacturing Europe B.V. Oudenstaart 1 5047 TK Tilburg / NL | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITAMI, Yujiro Lunterenstraat 53 NL-5045 WG Tilburg / NL | 02 /
GANDASASMITA, Iskandar Melickstraat 63 NL-5045 KZ Tilburg / NL | 03 /
KASE, Akira Nistelrodestraat 43 NL-5045 MD Tilburg / NL | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06783870.6 | 04.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006NL00403 | Priority number, date | EP20050076835 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: EP 05076835 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018421 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1919599 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D69/12, C08J5/22, B41M5/52, B01D69/02, B01D69/10, B41M5/00 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
B01D67/0006 (EP,US);
B01D67/009 (EP,US);
B01D69/00 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/1071 (EP,US);
B01D69/125 (EP,US);
B01D71/70 (EP,US);
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
B01D2323/345 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24496 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249955 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249981 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MIKROPORÖSEN MEMBRAN | [2012/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR OBTAINING A POROUS MEMBRANE | [2012/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE MEMBRANE POREUSE | [2012/35] |
Former [2008/20] | MIKROPORÖSE MEMBRAN UND DIESE ENTHALTENDES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | ||
Former [2008/20] | POROUS MEMBRANE AND RECORDING MEDIUM COMPRISING SAME | ||
Former [2008/20] | MEMBRANE POREUSE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LA COMPRENANT | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 25.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0216622 (GELMAN SCIENCES INC [US]); | [X]WO9325300 (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [DXA]EP0812697 (SCHOELLER TECH PAPERS [US]); | [DA]WO2004022201 (WHATMAN PLC [US]); | [DXA]WO2005016655 (FUJI PHOTO FILM BV [NL], et al) | Examination | WO2006101390 | by applicant | GB1549352 | GB2182046 | EP0251511 | JPH02107649 | US4942204 | JPH05177120 | FR2687589 | EP0738608 | WO9921723 | US6210808 | WO0188025 | WO0191999 | EP1289767 | WO2004022201 | EP1418058 | EP1477318 |