EP1937817 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING PIGMENT PRODUCTION IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The New Zealand Institute for Plant and Food Research Limited Mt Albert Research Centre 120 Mt Albert Road Mt Albert, Auckland / NZ | [2009/27] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states The Horticulture and Food Research Institute of New Zealand Limited 120 Mt. Albert Road Mt. Albert Auckland / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESPLEY, Richard 47 Pencarrow Avenue Epsom Auckland 1023 / NZ | 02 /
HELLENS, Roger Centre for Tropical Crops and Biocommodities Queensland University of Technology (QUT) GPO Box 2434 Brisbane Queensland 4001 / AU | 03 /
ALLAN, Andrew 23 Woodside Road Mt Eden Auckland / NZ | [2015/11] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
ESPLEY, Richard 35 Valley Road French Bay Auckland / NZ | ||
02 /
HELLENS, Roger 2a Kingsview Road Mt Eden Auckland / NZ | |||
03 /
ALLAN, Andrew 23 Woodside Road Mt Eden Auckland / NZ | Representative(s) | Forrester, Simon Joseph Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2015/34] |
Former [2008/27] | Forrester, Simon Joseph Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06784027.2 | 30.08.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006NZ00221 | Priority number, date | NZ20050542110 | 30.08.2005 Original published format: NZ 54211005 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007027105 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1937817 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937817 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07K14/415 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
C12N15/825 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8217 (EP,US);
C12N15/8237 (EP,US);
C12N15/8238 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | C12N15/29 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION DER PIGMENTPRODUKTION IN PFLANZEN | [2008/27] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING PIGMENT PRODUCTION IN PLANTS | [2008/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS SERVANT À MODULER LA PRODUCTION DE PIGMENTS DANS LES VÉGÉTAUX | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 04.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 10.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2006 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | IE | 30.08.2015 | LU | 30.08.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.08.2006 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0159103 (RIBOZYME PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * sequence 2468 *; | [Y] - "Arabidopsis thaliana production of anthocyanin pigment 1 protein (PAP1) gene, complete cds", EMBL, (20010207), Database accession no. AF325123, URL: NCBI, XP002495467 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * | [Y] - "Petunia x hybrida An2 protein (an2) mRNA, an2-V26 allele, complete cds.", EMBL, (20000501), Database accession no. AF146702, URL: NCBI, XP002495938 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * | [Y] - "Gerbera hybrid cv. 'Terra Regina' mRNA for MYB10 protein", EMBL, (20040105), Database accession no. AJ554700, URL: EBI, XP002495468 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - "SubName: Full=Myb-related transcription factor VlMYBA1-1;", UniProt, (20021001), Database accession no. Q8L5P3, URL: EBI, XP002495536 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - HOLTON T A ET AL, "Genetics and biochemistry of anthocyanin biosynthesis", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (19950101), vol. 7, no. 7, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 1071 - 1083, XP002406599 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.7.7.1071 | [T] - ESPLEY RICHARD V ET AL, "Red colouration in apple fruit is due to the activity of the MYB transcription factor, MdMYB10", PLANT JOURNAL, (200702), vol. 49, no. 3, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 414 - 427, XP002495466 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-313X.2006.02964.x | [ ] - BOREVITZ JUSTIN O ET AL, "Activation tagging identifies a conserved MYB regulator of phenylpropanoid biosynthesis", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (20001201), vol. 12, no. 12, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 2383 - 2393, XP002196250 [ ] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.12.12.2383 | [ ] - QUATTROCCHIO F ET AL, "Molecular analysis of the anthocyanin2 gene of Petunia and its role in the evolution of flower color", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (19990801), vol. 11, no. 8, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 1433 - 1444, XP002331095 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.11.8.1433 | [ ] - ELOMAA P ET AL, "Activation of Anthocyanin biosynthesis in Gerbera hybrida (Asteraceae) suggests conserved protein-protein and protein-promoter interactions between the anciently diverged monocots and eudicots", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (20031201), vol. 133, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1831 - 1842, XP003019790 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.103.026039 | [ ] - KOBAYASHI S ET AL, "Myb-related genes of the Kyoho grape (V.labruscana) regulate anthocyanin biosynthesis", PLANTA, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (20021001), vol. 215, ISSN 0032-0935, pages 924 - 933, XP002966677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00425-002-0830-5 | International search | [X]WO03084312 (EXELIXIS PLANT SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [X]WO02055658 (EXELIXIS PLANT SCIENCES INC [US]); | [X]WO2005001050 (ARBORGEN LLC [US], et al); | [X]US2004034888 (LIU JINGDONG [US], et al); | [X] - SWISSPROT, (20040705), Database accession no. (Q6V7V0), XP003013090 | [ ] - PLANT CELL, (2003), vol. 15, no. 8, pages 1689 - 1703 | [XP] - GENBANK, (20060721), Database accession no. (DQ267897), XP003013091 | [ ] - PLANT J., (2007), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 414 - 427 | [XP] - GENBANK, (20060721), Database accession no. (DQ267898), XP003013092 | [T] - GENBANK, (20061118), Database accession no. (DQ886415), XP003013093 | [ ] - PLANT PHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 142, no. 3, pages 1216 - 1232 | [X] - SWISSPROT, (20040301), Database accession no. (Q9ATD3), XP003013094 | [X] - SWISSPROT, (20040301), Database accession no. (Q9ATD5), XP003013095 | [X] - SWISSPROT, (20040705), Database accession no. (Q6QP46), XP003013096 | [ ] - GENOME RES., (2004), vol. 14, no. 10A, pages 1916 - 1923 | [XP] - GENBANK, (20060721), Database accession no. (DQ267900), XP003013097 | [X] - GENBANK, (20010315), Database accession no. (AF336284), XP003013098 | [XP] - GENBANK, (20060124), Database accession no. (DQ074463), XP003013099 | [ ] - PLANT METHODS, (2005), vol. 1, page 13 | Examination | - EMBL, (20050615), Database accession no. AB097924 | by applicant | - RAMSAY; GLOVER, TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 10, pages 63 - 70 | - DE VETTEN ET AL., GENES DEV, (1997), vol. 11, pages 1422 - 1434 | - WALKER ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1999), vol. 11, pages 1337 - 1350 | - KUBO ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1999), vol. 11, pages 1217 - 1226 | - DAVULURI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 890 - 895 |