EP1926554 - CURE CATALYST, COMPOSITION, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 260 Hudson River Road Waterford, NY 12188 / US | [2015/39] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 187 Danbury Road Wilton CT 06897-4122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUBINSZTAJN, Slawomir 1105 Highland Park Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
CAMPBELL, John, Robert 5269 Sagamore Road Putnam Station, NY 12861 / US | 03 /
MILLS, Ryan, Christopher 4 South Carolina Court Rexford, NY 12148 / US | 04 /
TONAPI, Sandeep, Shrikant 732 West Hemlock Way Chandler, Arizona 85248 / US | 05 /
PRABHAKUMAR, Ananth 2763 East Boston Street Gilbert, Arizona 85297 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
RUBINSZTAJN, Slawomir 1105 Highland Park Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | ||
02 /
CAMPBELL, John, Robert 5269 Sagamore Road Putnam Station, NY 12861 / US | |||
03 /
MILLS, Ryan, Christopher 4 South Carolina Court Rexford, NY 12148 / US | |||
04 /
TONAPI, Sandeep, Shrikant 732 West Hemlock Way Chandler, Arizona 85248 / US | |||
05 /
PRABHAKUMAR, Ananth 3600 West Ray Road Chandler, Arizona 85226 / US | |||
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
RUBINSZTAJN, Slawomir 1105 Highland Park Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | ||
02 /
CAMPBELL, John, Robert 41 Pepper Hollow Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | |||
03 /
MILLS, Ryan, Christopher 4 South Carolina Court Rexford, NY 12148 / US | |||
04 /
TONAPI, Sandeep, Shrikant 1187 HILLSIDE AVENUE, Apartment 4a45 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | |||
05 /
PRABHAKUMAR, Ananth 14c Candlelight Court Clifton, NY 12065 / US | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06784726.9 | 09.06.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006US22587 | Priority number, date | US20050167847 | 23.06.2005 Original published format: US 167847 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007001803 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1926554 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/00, C08G59/68, C08G59/70, H01L23/29 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
H01L23/293 (EP,US);
B01J31/00 (KR);
B01J31/0237 (EP,US);
B01J31/0244 (EP,US);
B01J31/146 (EP,US);
C08G59/68 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/70 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L23/29 (KR);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8121 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81815 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01032 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01049 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0106 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01073 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01087 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12044, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄRTUNGSKATALYSATOR, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ELEKTRONISCHES BAUTEIL UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2008/23] | English: | CURE CATALYST, COMPOSITION, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2008/23] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE DURCISSEMENT, COMPOSITION, DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE ET METHODE ASSOCIEE | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2012 | Observations by third parties | 03.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Divisional application(s) | EP10014910.3 / EP2283922 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 24.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 24.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 24.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2970130 (FINESTONE ARNOLD B) [X] 1,2,4 * claim 1 * * column 3 - column 4; examples I-IX *; | [X]US3347827 (LEE JR HENRY L) [X] 1,2,4 * column 5; examples 3,4 * * claims 1-4 *; | [X]US5106928 (SKOULTCHI MARTIN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 7 - column 8; example 1 * * claims 1,5-7 *; | [X]US5721183 (NEITHAMER DAVID R [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * column 12; examples 1,4 * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0860458 (REILLY IND INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,5 *; | [X]WO0144311 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,3 ** page 29; example 65 * | other | WO0130903 | WO02092665 | WO03062208 | - REN K. ET AL, "Studies of Weakly Anions Paired with Iodonium Cations", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20020101), vol. 35, no. 5, doi:10.1021/ma010823o, pages 1632 - 1637, XP002259287 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma010823o |