|
01.07.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
09.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2011 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
29 |