Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020049748 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99343007 | 20.12.2007 | WO2006US24056 | 20.06.2006 | US201916580921 | 24.09.2019 | US69230105 | 20.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010148787 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99343006 | 20.06.2006 | WO2006US24056 | 20.06.2006 | US69230105 | 20.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006262325B | Global Dossier | 03.12.2009 | B2 | AU2006262325 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US24056 | 20.06.2006 | US69230105 | 20.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1896874 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2014 | B1 | EP1896874 | 26.10.2011 | A4 | EP1896874 | 12.03.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US24056 | 20.06.2006 | US69230105 | 20.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0613349 | 04.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US24056 | 20.06.2006 | US69230105 | 20.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007002132 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2007 | A3 | WO2007002132 | 04.01.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US69230105 | 20.06.2005 |