04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
13.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
15.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
15.07.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
24.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
06.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] |
08.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
01.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
28.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
06.08.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
03.08.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
03.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.02.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.01.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.09.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.02.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2008 |
First examination report |
|
29.08.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
20.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
01.02.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
01.02.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
15.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|