EP1910451 - COATED POLYMERIC FILM WITH OXYGEN BARRIER PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Polyester Film, Inc. 2001 Hood Road Greer SC 29650 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POSEY, Robert, Giles 157 Berrys Pond Drive Duncan, South Carolina 29334-9586 / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/36] | Schweitzer, Klaus Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Schweitzer, Klaus Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06785369.7 | 22.06.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US24357 | Priority number, date | US20050692883P | 22.06.2005 Original published format: US 692883 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007002322 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910451 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1910451 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (KR);
B05D3/0254 (KR);
B05D7/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29C55/02 (KR);
B32B27/36 (KR);
C08J7/0427 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/048 (EP,US);
C08J7/08 (KR);
C08K5/0025 (KR);
C08K5/09 (KR);
C09D129/04 (EP,US);
B32B2323/00 (KR);
B32B2323/04 (KR);
B32B2367/00 (KR);
C08J2323/00 (KR);
C08J2323/02 (KR);
C08J2367/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2429/00 (EP,US);
C08J2429/02 (KR);
C08L35/00 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1379 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1383 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D129/04, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, LU [2009/37] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE POLYMERFOLIE MIT SAUERSTOFFBARRIEREEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2008/17] | English: | COATED POLYMERIC FILM WITH OXYGEN BARRIER PROPERTIES | [2008/16] | French: | FILM POLYMERIQUE ENDUIT AYANT DES PROPRIETES DE BARRIERE CONTRE L'OXYGENE | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/16] | BESCHICHTETE POLYMERFOLIE MITSAUERSTOFFBARRIEREEIGENSCHAFTEN | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 05.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003124365 (POSEY ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A] - MASATO AOYAMA ET AL, "APPLICATION OF (VINYL ALCOHOL)-(VINYL AMINE) COPOLYMER", POLYMER PREPRINTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (2004), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0032-3934, pages 853 - 854, XP009062711 [A] 1 |