16.01.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
07.02.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.09.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.09.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
06.09.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.08.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2010 |
First examination report |
|
23.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
20.06.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
20.06.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
02.05.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
04.03.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.02.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
08.02.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
02.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|