EP1897254 - AUTOMATED OPTICAL LINK POWER CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infinera Corporation 1322 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITCHELL, Matthew, L. 751 Sweetbay Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
TAYLOR, Robert, B. 8 Ali Marie Court Windsor Mill, MD 21244 / US | 03 /
SPRAGUE, Edward, E. 25 Roan Place Woodside, CA 94062 / US | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06785370.5 | 23.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006US24358 | Priority number, date | US20050695521P | 30.06.2005 Original published format: US 695521 P | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007005324 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1897254 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1897254 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/293, H04B10/296 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
H04B10/296 (EP,US);
H04B10/2935 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/11] | H04B10/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/30] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG EINER OPTISCHEN VERBINDUNG | [2008/11] | English: | AUTOMATED OPTICAL LINK POWER CONTROL | [2008/11] | French: | COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE DE LIAISON OPTIQUE AUTOMATISEE | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 31.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE19838788 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,26-28 * column 1, line 49 - line 61 * * column 2, line 31 - line 64 * * figures 2-5 * [I] 6-8; | [A]US2002093729 (GERISH KEVIN S [US], et al) [A] 1,9,19,26* paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *; | [A]US6690505 (YE JUN [US]) [A] 1,9,19,26 * paragraphs [0064] , [0073]; figures 1,10,11 * | by applicant | DE19838788 |