EP1894235 - METHOD OF PREPARING ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | For all designated states Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | [2013/22] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
For all designated states Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | |||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states Konarka Technologies, Inc. 116 John Street Suite 12 Lowell, MA 01852 / US | ||
For all designated states Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUDIANA, Russell 2 Penrose Lane Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | 02 /
MONTELLO, Alan 10 Albion Lane West Newbury, MA 01985 / US | 03 /
MONTELLO, Edmund 1 Back Beach Way Rockport, MA 01966 / US | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2013/15] |
Former [2008/10] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Regus Business Center Landsberger Strasse 155 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06785419.0 | 23.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006US24449 | Priority number, date | US20050693829P | 24.06.2005 Original published format: US 693829 P | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007002376 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1894235 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/66, G01R31/26, H05K3/04 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H10K71/611 (EP,US);
B03C3/40 (KR);
H01L22/00 (KR);
H01L31/18 (EP,US);
H10K30/81 (EP,US);
H05K3/046 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1067 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | H01L21/66, G01R31/26 | ||
Former IPC [2008/10] | H01L21/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRODE | [2008/10] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING ELECTRODE | [2008/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ELECTRODE | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 23.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 05.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.06.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2012/30] | 01.03.2013 | Resumption of proceedings | [2013/03] | 01.06.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2013/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4393576 (DAHLBERG REINHARD [DE]) [X] 1,9,13-15,24,25,29,30,34 * claims 1, 7 * [Y] 2-5,7,16,23,26,27,31,32 [I] 6,8,10-12,17-22,28,33; | [Y]WO9837740 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 2-5,7,23,26,27,31,32 * claim 1 * * page 8, line 29 ** page 8, line 7 *; | [XY] - KIM CHANGSOON ET AL, "Nanolithography based on patterned metal transfer and its application to organic electronic devices", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20020527), vol. 80, no. 21, doi:10.1063/1.1481980, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 4051 - 4053, XP012031052 [X] 24,29,34 * page 4052, column 1, paragraph 2 * [Y] 16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1481980 | International search | [X]US2004187917 (PICHLER KARL [US]) | Examination | WO2004086462 |