EP1895918 - ORTHOPEDIC CLAMPING HOOK ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Spine Sàrl Chemin-Blanc 36 2400 Le Locle / CH | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAKE, Matthew 5620 Paseo Del Norte No. 127-119 Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | 02 /
HALL, Mark 16 Brownfield Drive Bridgewater, MA 02324 / US | 03 /
KONIECZYNSKI, David 107 Ellicott Street Needham, MA 02492 / US | [2009/11] |
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
LAKE, Matthew 29 Hill Avenue Dedham, MA 02026 / US | ||
02 /
HALL, Mark 16 Brownfield Drive Bridgewater, MA 02324 / US | |||
03 /
KONIECZYNSKI, David 107 Ellicott Street Needham, MA 02492 / US | Representative(s) | Orr, Robert, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Orr, Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2008/11] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way GB-Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06785918.1 | 28.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006US25491 | Priority number, date | US20050174169 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: US 174169 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007005561 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1895918 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/56 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
A61B17/7055 (EP,US);
A61B17/7044 (EP,US);
A61B17/7047 (EP,US);
A61B17/7056 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B17/7035 (EP,US);
A61B17/7037 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTHOPÄDISCHE KLEMMHAKENBAUGRUPPE | [2008/11] | English: | ORTHOPEDIC CLAMPING HOOK ASSEMBLY | [2008/11] | French: | ENSEMBLE CROCHET DE SERRAGE ORTHOPEDIQUE | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 03.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 28.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2642642 (COTREL YVES [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,8,11 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 33; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5609593 (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al) [Y] 9,12* abstract *; | [X]US6387097 (ALBY ALBERT [CH]) [X] 1,3-4,6,11,13-14 * column 3, lines 17-51; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2003130659 (HAIDER THOMAS T [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032]; figures 2,3 * [I] 4-6,8,11; | [Y]WO2005037115 (EUROSURGICAL [FR], et al) [Y] 14 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 3; figure 6 *; | [XYI]WO2005051213 (DEPUY INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6,11 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 10; figures 1-3 * [Y] 9,12,14 [I] 4-5 | International search | [Y]US5415659 (LEE CASEY K [US], et al); | [Y]US5545164 (HOWLAND ROBERT S [US]); | [X]US6860884 (SHIRADO OSAMU [JP], et al); | [Y] - FAURE ET AL., "Inverted-hook occipital clamp system in occipitocervical fixation", J. NEUROSURG., (2002), vol. 97, pages 135 - 141, XP008125104 | by applicant | FR2642642 | US5609593 | US6387097 | US2003100896 | US2003130659 | US2004181224 | US2004186473 | WO2005037115 | WO2005051213 |