EP1906855 - ELECTRODES USING TWO-PHASE HEAT TRANSFER AND MULTI-VARIATE ALGORITHMS FOR IMPROVED TEMPERATURE MONITORING AND CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Langberg, Edwin 56 Bridge Road Lumberton, NJ 08048 / US | For all designated states Langberg, Jonathan 871 Sprindale Road NE Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06786366.2 | 05.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US26189 | Priority number, date | US20050696697P | 05.07.2005 Original published format: US 696697 P | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007005963 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906855 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00666 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODEN MIT ZWEIPHASIGEN WÄRMETRANSFER UND MULTIVARIATEN ALGORITHMEN FÜR DIE VERBESSERTE TEMPERATURÜBERWACHUNG UND KONTROLLE | [2008/15] | English: | ELECTRODES USING TWO-PHASE HEAT TRANSFER AND MULTI-VARIATE ALGORITHMS FOR IMPROVED TEMPERATURE MONITORING AND CONTROL | [2008/15] | French: | ELECTRODES METTANT EN APPLICATION DES ALGORITHMES DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR A DEUX PHASES ET VARIATIONS MULTIPLES POUR AMELIORER LE CONTROLE ET LA REGULATION DE LA TEMPERATURE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 02.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/33] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5647871 (LEVINE ANDY H [US], et al); | [Y]US5688266 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al); | [Y]US5871443 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) |