EP1910229 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SLURRY TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2010 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Water Technologies Corp. 181 Thorn Hill Road Warrendale, PA 15086 / US | [2009/30] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Siemens Water Technologies Corp. 10 Technology Drive Lowell, MA 01851 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISMER, Michael, W. 6712 Partridge Place Lino Lakes, MN 55014-1334 / US | 02 /
WOODLING, Richard 16 Highgate Walk Singapore 598761 / SG | 03 /
DAY, James, C. 958 Bayard Avenue Saint Paul, MN 55102 / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Hazzard, Alan David Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 Munich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Hazzard, Alan David Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 06786476.9 | 07.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US26336 | Priority number, date | US20050195108 | 02.08.2005 Original published format: US 195108 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007018854 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1910229 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/42, B01J45/00 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
B01J45/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (EP,US);
C02F1/4676 (EP,US);
C02F1/66 (EP,US);
C02F2001/425 (EP,US);
C02F2101/30 (EP,US);
C02F2103/346 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/16] | C02F1/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHLAMMVERARBEITUNG | [2008/16] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SLURRY TREATMENT | [2008/16] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE BOUE | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 28.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/15] | 16.03.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.05.2010 | 18.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0040512 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-15,23-27,31-35 * page 1, lines 4-13 * * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, lines 19-22 * * page 5, lines 6-24 * * page 6, lines 8-16 * * page 7, lines 1-7 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 22 ** claims 1,6,8-11,16 *; | [X]US6203705 (JAMES DUSTIN KIMBEL [US], et al) [X] 1-39 * column 1, lines 13-16,59-63 * * column 2, lines 11-23,54-56 * * column 3, lines 30-34 * * column 4, lines 31-35 * * column 5, lines 47-66 * * claims 1,3,5 * | International search | [Y]US6069209 (DARLING GRAHAM [CA], et al); | [A]US6346195 (FILSON JAMES L [US], et al); | [Y]US6521131 (HAMILTON RICHARD A [US], et al); | [A]US2003044335 (JANGBARWALA JUZER [US]); | [X]US6818129 (KEMP PHILIP M [US], et al); | [A]US6896808 (JAY BILL [AU]) | by applicant | US5346627 | US5348712 | US5464605 | US5476883 | US5599515 | US6315906 | US6346195 | US6818129 |