EP1903955 - CURETTE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyphon SÀRL rue du Puits-Godet 12/12a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2009/17] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Kyphon Inc. 1221 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHAN, Christopher U. 16251 Miramar Place San Leandro, California 94578 / US | 02 /
SANKARAN, Meera 19984 Wheaton Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
CANTU, Alberto Ruiz 647 Cole Street San Francisco, California 94117 / US | 04 /
LAYNE, Richard W. 10302 South 16th Avenue Phoenix, Arizona 85041 / US | [2008/50] |
Former [2008/14] | 01 /
PHAN, Christopher U. 16251 Miramar Place San Leandro, California 94578 / US | ||
02 /
SANKARAN, Meera 19984 Wheaton Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | |||
03 /
CANTU, Alberto Ruiz 1115 Fell Street 3 San Francisco, California 94117 / US | |||
04 /
LAYNE, Richard W. 316 E. McKinley Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2008/14] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Regus Business Center Landsberger Strasse 155 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06786518.8 | 06.07.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006US26386 | Priority number, date | US20050698408P | 11.07.2005 Original published format: US 698408 P | US20050698354P | 11.07.2005 Original published format: US 698354 P | US20060756677P | 06.01.2006 Original published format: US 756677 P | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007008611 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903955 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61B17/28 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/16 (EP,US);
A61B17/22 (KR);
A61B17/28 (KR);
A61B17/3207 (EP,US);
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B17/320708 (EP,US);
A61B17/320725 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00539 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2837 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2845 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2912 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KURETTENSYSTEM | [2008/14] | English: | CURETTE SYSTEM | [2008/14] | French: | SYSTEME DE CURETAGE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9603930 (UTAH MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,10 * figures 1,6 * * page 11, line 2 - line 12 * * page 15, line 34 - page 16, line 17 * * page 16, line 18 - page 17, line 17 * [Y] 3-6; | [XY]US2003158576 (NAGASE TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * figures 12,13,29-32 * * paragraphs [0162] - [0169] * [Y] 3-6; | [Y]US6053908 (CRAINICH LAWRENCE [US], et al) [Y] 3-6 * abstract * * figures 9,10,12 *; | [Y]US2005070885 (NOBIS RUDOLPH [US], et al) [Y] 3-6 * figures 10,13,14 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0037] , [0054] , [0059] , [0062] *; | [DA]WO2005023085 (KYPHON INC [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,7,10 * figures 11,15-18,21-23 * |