EP1901646 - PHOTOFORMED SILICONE SENSOR MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Point of Care Inc. 104 East Windsor Center Drive East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US | [2010/01] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states I-STAT CORPORATION 104 Windsor Center Drive East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCANN, Margot, Leanne 355 Berkley Avenue Ottawa, ON K2A 2G9 / CA | 02 /
SHAW, Sandra, Kay 124 Penfield Drive Ottawa, ON K2K 1M5 / CA | 03 /
UNDERWOOD, Karl John Anthony 1380 Micmac Street Ottawa, ON K1H 5N5 / CA | 04 /
RABE, Harvey, Eric 460 Crooked Side Road, Rr3 Ashton, ON K0A 1B0 / CA | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2017/14] |
Former [2008/13] | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06786926.3 | 12.07.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006US26939 | Priority number, date | US20050698927P | 14.07.2005 Original published format: US 698927 P | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007011587 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1901646 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1901646 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/05, C12Q1/00, B01D71/70 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/13] | A61B5/00, A61B5/05 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2017/14] |
Former [2008/43] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DURCH LICHT GEBILDETE SILICIUMSENSORENMEMBRAN | [2016/42] | English: | PHOTOFORMED SILICONE SENSOR MEMBRANE | [2008/13] | French: | MEMBRANE DE DETECTION PHOTOFORMEE EN SILICONE | [2008/13] |
Former [2008/13] | LICHTGEFORMTE SILICIUMSENSORENMEMBRAN | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | [2018/15] |
Former [2017/50] | ES | 05.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004231984 (LAUKS IMANTS [CA], et al) [X] 1-32 * paragraphs [0047] , [0064] - [0069] - [0211] , [0212] , [0249] - [0267]; claims 1-48 * | International search | [Y]US2004074785 (HOLKER JAMES D [US], et al); | [Y]US6030827 (DAVIS GRAHAM [US], et al); | [Y]US6770726 (ARKLES BARRY C [US], et al); | [Y]US6413393 (VAN ANTWERP WILLIAM P [US], et al) | Examination | WO2006023037 | WO0076634 | - LOSADA J ET AL, "Ferrocenyl and permethylferrocenyl cyclic and polyhedral siloxane polymers as mediators in amperometric biosensors", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20040901), vol. 689, no. 17, doi:10.1016/J.JORGANCHEM.2004.06.009, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 2799 - 2807, XP004524279 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jorganchem.2004.06.009 | by applicant | US5200051 | US6030827 | US5514253 | US4933048 | US6737117 | US6770726 | WO2006023037 | US5112455 | US4933087 | US5554339 |