EP1917131 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOADING A TREAD PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2011/25] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique Route Louis-Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | ||
For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPIN, Bernard 9 Shady Brook Lane Greenville, South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
LOUCHART, Theophile Henry 670 Newman Road Roebuck, South Carolina 29376 / US | 03 /
PIKE, William Gibbs 1410 Highway 247 Belton, South Carolina 29627 / US | [2008/21] |
Former [2008/19] | 01 /
PAPIN, Bernard 9 Shady Brook Lane Greenville, South Carolina 29615 / US | ||
02 /
LOUCHART, Theophile Henry 670 Newman Road Roebuck, Rhode Island 29376 / US | |||
03 /
PIKE, William Gibbs 1410 Highway 247 Belton, South Carolina 29627 / US | Representative(s) | Schlief, Thomas P. Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Schlief, Thomas P. Patentanwälte Canzler & Bergmeier Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [2008/19] | Schlief, Thomas P. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 06786983.4 | 10.07.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006US27007 | Priority number, date | US20050191816 | 28.07.2005 Original published format: US 191816 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007018928 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1917131 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1917131 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C31/08, B29D30/00 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
B29C31/08 (EP,US);
B29C43/021 (EP,US);
B29D30/0016 (EP,US);
B29C2043/023 (EP,US);
B29L2030/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | B29C31/08 | ||
Former IPC [2008/19] | B29C31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN EINER LAUFFLÄCHENPRESSE | [2008/19] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOADING A TREAD PRESS | [2008/19] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE CHARGEMENT D'UNE PRESSE DE BANDE DE ROULEMENT | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.06.2011 | BE | 22.06.2011 | CY | 22.06.2011 | CZ | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | HU | 22.06.2011 | LT | 22.06.2011 | LV | 22.06.2011 | NL | 22.06.2011 | PL | 22.06.2011 | RO | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | TR | 22.06.2011 | IE | 10.07.2011 | LU | 10.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | GB | 22.09.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | ES | 03.10.2011 | IS | 22.10.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 10.07.2011 | ||
LU | 10.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GB | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 10.07.2011 | ||
LU | 10.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GB | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 10.07.2011 | ||
LU | 10.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GB | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 10.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GB | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 10.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GB | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 10.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 22.06.2011 | |
SE | 22.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2032246 (VAKUUM VULK HOLDINGS LTD., NASSAU, BAHAMAS) [A] 1-20 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 23 * * page 4, lines 1-23; figure 1; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US3966380 (KOSIK JR SAMUEL J) [A] 1-20 * column 1, lines 8-51 * * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 48; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH02167733 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [A]JP2001001358 (FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | International search | [A]US1986092 (ABBOTT JR ADRIAN O) | by applicant | US1986092 | DE2032246 | US3966380 | JPH02167733 | JP2001001358 |