EP1902601 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR CONTINUOUSLY DEPOSITING A PATTERN OF MATERIAL ONTO A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCLURE, Donald J., 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
TOKIE, Jeffrey H., 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
CARLSON, Daniel H., 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
DOBBS, James N., 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
STRAND, John T., 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
SWANSON, Ronald P., 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm, Stefan 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Wilhelm, Stefan 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 D-41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 06787025.3 | 11.07.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006US27063 | Priority number, date | US20050179418 | 12.07.2005 Original published format: US 179418 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007008992 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1902601 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/12, B41F15/08 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
H05K3/143 (EP);
B41F15/0836 (EP);
C23C14/042 (EP);
C23C14/562 (EP);
B41P2215/12 (EP);
H05K1/0393 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN AUFTRAGUNG EINER MATERIALSTRUKTUR AUF EIN SUBSTRAT | [2008/13] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR CONTINUOUSLY DEPOSITING A PATTERN OF MATERIAL ONTO A SUBSTRATE | [2008/13] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DEPOT CONTINU DE MOTIF DE MATERIAU SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 13.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/33] | 28.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0135703 (SPEEDLINE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, lines 6-20 * * page 6, lines 25-33 *; | [A]US5395643 (BROWN JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,9,19-21,25 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 9 *; | [A]GB2248039 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1,19,25 * abstract *; | [DA]US2005109811 (SWANSON RONALD P [US], et al) [DA] 4-7,11-13,18,19,22,24 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6897164 | US2005109811 |