EP1907307 - MODULAR PAPER TOWEL DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBRICK WASHROOM EQUIPMENT, INC. 11611 Hart Street North Hollywood California 91605-5882 / US | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABIKIAN, Dikran 1748 Hillcrest Avenue Glendale, CA 91202 / US | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06787339.8 | 14.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US27418 | Priority number, date | US20050189136 | 18.07.2005 Original published format: US 189136 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007011747 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1907307 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65H16/06, A47K10/38 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A47K10/38 (EP,US);
A47K10/46 (EP);
A47K2010/3233 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | B65H16/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARER PAPIERHANDTUCHSPENDER | [2008/15] | English: | MODULAR PAPER TOWEL DISPENSER | [2008/15] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR MODULAIRE D'ESSUIE-MAINS EN PAPIER | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 07.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3147051 (BIRR RICHARD T, et al) [Y] 1-3,8-28 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5154496 (CAMPBELL WILLIAM E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,8-28* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2470187 (PRICE LAURENCE L); | [X]US4611768 (VOSS THOMAS C [US], et al) |