EP1913412 - AXIALLY CONSTRAINED NMR RF PROBE COIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2013/02] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Varian, Inc. 3120 Hansen Way, D-102 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENS, Albert, P. 12327 Maravilla Drive Salinas, CA 93908 / US | 02 /
NAKATANI, Peter 937 Oak Grove Road Concord, CA 94518 / US | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Burger, Markus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Burger, Markus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Mollekopf, Gerd Willi Kahler Käck Mollekopf, Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg a. Lech / DE | Application number, filing date | 06787601.1 | 18.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US27711 | Priority number, date | US20050198077 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: US 198077 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018977 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913412 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913412 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/34 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
G01R33/34069 (EP,US);
G01R33/34076 (EP,US);
G01R33/34092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACHSGESPANNTE NMR-RF-SONDENSPULE | [2008/17] | English: | AXIALLY CONSTRAINED NMR RF PROBE COIL | [2008/17] | French: | BOBINE DE SONDE HF NMR LIMITÉE AXIALEMENT | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 04.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2012 | 07.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2006 | AT | 09.01.2013 | BE | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | IT | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | MC | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | TR | 09.01.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | IE | 18.07.2013 | LU | 18.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 18.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 18.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5210494 (BRUNNER HERMANN [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,10 * column 14, line 67 - column 15, line 68; figures 16,17 *; | [X]US2002153895 (HASEGAWA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,8-10 * paragraphs [0038] - [0042] - [0045] , [0046]; figures 9-11,14 *; | [X]WO9102261 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [X] 1,3-5,10 * page 16, line 12 - page 17, line 16 * * page 24, line 13 - page 25, line 3; figures 3,14,15; claims 5,6 *; | [X]JPS6478137 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10 * abstract *; | [X]US6535084 (TROPP JAMES S [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8,10 * column 5, line 32 - column 8, line 48; figures 3,4,6 *; | [A]WO0186324 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1,3,8-10 * figures 2,9; examples 1,3 * | by applicant | US6917201 | - VAUGN, J.B. JR, SPECTROSCOPY, (1995), vol. L0, page 36 |