EP1919468 - TREATMENT WITH AZETIDINONE-BASED CHOLESTEROL ABSORPTION INHIBITORS AND OMEGA-3 FATTY ACIDS AND A COMBINATION PRODUCT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reliant Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 110 Allen Road Liberty Corner, NJ 07938 / US | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RONGEN, Roelof M. L. RELIANT PHARMACEUTICALS, Inc., 110 Allen Road Liberty Corner, NJ 07938 / US | 02 /
SHALWITZ, Robert A. RELIANT PHARMACEUTICALS, Inc., 110 Allen Road Liberty Corner, NJ 07938 / US | 03 /
BOBOTAS, George RELIANT PHARMACEUTICALS, Inc., 110 Allen Road Liberty Corner, NJ 07938 / US | 04 /
FAWZY, Abdel RELIANT PHARMACEUTICALS, Inc., 110 Allen Road Liberty Corner, NJ 07938 / US | 05 /
BODD, Egil PRONOVA BIOCARE AS, P.o. Box 420 1327 Lysaker XX / NO | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Cooke, Tracey, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Cooke, Tracey, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property CN925.1 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | Cooke, Tracey, et al GlaxoSmithKline R & D Limited Corporate Intellectual Property - 1S213a Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06787615.1 | 18.07.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006US27726 | Priority number, date | US20050699866P | 18.07.2005 Original published format: US 699866 P | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007011886 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1919468 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/405, A61K31/202, A61K31/397, A61K9/28, A61P3/06, A61P9/00 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (KR);
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K31/397 (EP,US);
A61K31/401 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/4808 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61K9/4891 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K9/209 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/397, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/21] | A61K31/405, A61K31/202 | ||
Former IPC [2008/20] | A61K31/401, A61K31/366, A61K31/22, A61K31/202 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG MIT CHOLESTERIN-ABSORPTIONSHEMMERN AUF AZETIDINON-BASIS UND OMEGA-3-FETTSÄUREN UND EINEM KOMBINATIONSPRODUKT DARAUS | [2008/20] | English: | TREATMENT WITH AZETIDINONE-BASED CHOLESTEROL ABSORPTION INHIBITORS AND OMEGA-3 FATTY ACIDS AND A COMBINATION PRODUCT THEREOF | [2008/20] | French: | TRAITEMENT AU MOYEN D'INHIBITEURS D'ABSORPTION DE CHOLESTEROL A BASE D'AZETIDINONE ET D'ACIDE GRAS OMEGA-3 ET PRODUIT DE COMBINAISON DE CEUX-CI | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 13.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T] - MITKA MIKE, "Cholesterol drug controversy continues.", JAMA : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION 21 MAY 2008, (20080521), vol. 299, no. 19, ISSN 1538-3598, page 2266, XP009127524 [T] * page 2266, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.299.19.2266 | International search | [Y]US2003053981 (DAVIS HARRY R [US], et al); | [Y]US2003153541 (DUDLEY ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]WO2004058281 (NUTRINOVA GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]WO2004082559 (DOC S GUIDE INC [US], et al); | [Y] - NORDOY ET AL., "The Effect of Fish Oil and Lovastatin on Lipoproteins and Blood-Vessel Wall Reactivity in Familial Hypercholesterolemia", OMEGA-3-FATTY ACIDS:METABOLISM AND BIOLOGICAL EFFECTS, (1993), pages 231 - 240, XP009127540 | [Y] - HONG ET AL., "Effects of Simvastatin Combined with Omega-3 Fatty Acids on High Sensitive C-Reactive Protein, Lipidemia, and Fibrinolysis in Patients with Mixed Dyslipidemia", CHIN MED SCI J., (2004), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 145 - 149, XP009127537 | [Y] - NORDOY ET AL., "Effects of Simvastatin and Omega-3 Fatty Acids on Plasma Lipoproteins and Lipid Peroxidation in Patients with Combined Hyperlipidaemia", JOURNAL OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 243, pages 163 - 170, XP002371430 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2796.1998.00297.x |