EP1910573 - METHODS FOR REDUCING VIRAL LOAD IN HIV-1-INFECTED PATIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CytoDyn, Inc. 5 Centerpointe Drive, Suite 400 Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | [2013/07] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSON, William, C. 21 Fawn Court Ossining, NY 10562 / US | 02 /
MADDON, Paul, J. 191 Fox Meadow Road Scarsdale, NY 10583 / US | 03 /
PEVEAR, Daniel, C. 256 Morris Road Harleysville, PA 19438 / US | 04 /
ISRAEL, Robert, J. 50 Oxford Drive Suffern, NY 10901 / US | 05 /
MURGA, Jose, D. 244-12 137th Road Rosedale, NY 11422 / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Almond-Martin, Carol, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges 69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2013/36] |
Former [2008/16] | Almond-Martin, Carol, et al ERNEST GUTMANN - YVES PLASSERAUD S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges 69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06788240.7 | 21.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US28565 | Priority number, date | US20050701889P | 23.07.2005 Original published format: US 701889 P | US20050702064P | 22.07.2005 Original published format: US 702064 P | US20050711528P | 26.08.2005 Original published format: US 711528 P | US20050715619P | 09.09.2005 Original published format: US 715619 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007014114 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1910573 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1910573 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61K39/42 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/351 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/39 (US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/46 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (US);
A61K38/195 (US);
A61K39/39541 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | A61K39/42, C07K16/00, A01N61/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/16] | C12Q1/68, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | 21.02.2008 | BA | 21.02.2008 | HR | 21.02.2008 | MK | 21.02.2008 | RS | 21.02.2008 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER VIRUSLAST IN MIT HIV-1 INFIZIERTEN PATIENTEN | [2008/17] | English: | METHODS FOR REDUCING VIRAL LOAD IN HIV-1-INFECTED PATIENTS | [2008/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR LA RÉDUCTION DE LA CHARGE VIRALE CHEZ DES PATIENTS INFECTÉS PAR LE VIH 1 | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/16] | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER VIRUSLAST IN MIT HIV-1INFIZIERTEN PATIENTEN | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 10.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2012 | 27.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.01.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.02.2013 | 05.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2006 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.07.2006 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03072766 (PROGENICS PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 22-23,25-28,31,38 * pg. 4 pg. 30, sec. paragraph pg. 44, sec. paragraph * [Y] 1-21,29-30,32-37; | [Y] - Genentech, "Herceptin / Trastuzumab", (2003), URL: http://www.cancerconsultants.com/druginserts/trastuzumab.pdf', (20100211), XP007911675 [Y] 1-21,23,25-38 * first page * | [Y] - MAEDA KENJI ET AL, "Spirodiketopiperazine-based CCR5 inhibitor which preserves CC-chemokine/CCR5 interactions and exerts potent activity against R5 human immunodeficiency virus type 1 in vitro.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY AUG 2004, (200408), vol. 78, no. 16, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 8654 - 8662, XP002568117 [Y] 32-34 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.16.8654-8662.2004 | [XY] - OLSON W C ET AL, "Resistance to HIV-1 entry inhibitors.", CURRENT DRUG TARGETS - INFECTIOUS DISORDERS, (200312), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1568-0053, pages 283 - 294, XP009129415 [X] 22,24 * 287-289 * [Y] 1-21,23,25-38 | [XY] - OLSON W C ET AL, "DIFFERENTIAL INHIBITION OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 FUSION, GP120 BINDING, AND CC-CHEMOKINE ACTIVITY BY MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TO CCR5", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19990501), vol. 73, no. 5, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 4145 - 4155, XP009129481 [X] 22,24 * abstract * [Y] 1-21,23,25-38 | [A] - POLI G, "PRO-140 (Progenics)", IDRUGS, CURRENT DRUGS LTD, GB, (20010901), vol. 4, no. 9, ISSN 1369-7056, pages 1068 - 1071, XP009129422 [A] 1-38 * the whole document * | [A] - KETAS T J ET AL, "Human immunodeficiency virus type 1 attachment, coreceptor, and fusion inhibitors are active against both direct and trans infection of primary cells", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20030201), vol. 77, no. 4, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 2762 - 2767, XP002404182 [A] 1-38 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.4.2762-2767.2003 | International search | [Y]US2002146415 (OLSON WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [Y]US2002177603 (JOHNSON BARRY L [DE], et al); | [Y]US2003228306 (OLSON WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [Y]US2005131042 (FLENTGE CHARLES A [US], et al) | Examination | WO2008134076 | by applicant | WO0162255 | WO03082289 |