EP1908080 - ADVANCED GRAY ROD CONTROL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 4350 Northern Pike Monroeville, PA 15146-2866 / US | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FETTERMAN, Robert, J. 3940 Laurel Oak Circle Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | 02 /
SPARROW, James, A. 112 Blazing Cove Irmo, SC 29063 / US | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [2015/25] |
Former [2008/38] | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Gallo, Wolfgang Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06788540.0 | 24.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US29005 | Priority number, date | US20050189472 | 26.07.2005 Original published format: US 189472 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007014260 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1908080 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908080 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G21C7/00 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
G21C7/10 (EP,US);
G21C7/06 (KR);
G21C7/00 (KR);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2015/25] |
Former [2008/45] | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE | ||
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FORTSCHRITTLICHE GRAUSTABKONTROLLVORRICHTUNG | [2015/14] | English: | ADVANCED GRAY ROD CONTROL ASSEMBLY | [2008/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE COMMANDE DE BARRE GRISE EVOLUE | [2008/15] |
Former [2008/15] | FORTGESCHRITTENE GRAUSTABKONTROLLVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3255092 (DEE JR JOHN B) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,10,11,13-15,17,18; | [A]GB2169127 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,6,13* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2859163 (PLOETZ GEORGE L, et al); | [Y]US2983817 (EARLEY JAMES W, et al); | [A]US4172760 (BALLARD CHARLES H [US], et al); | [X]US5064607 (MILLER JOHN V [US], et al); | [A]US5167900 (ODAKA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US6275556 (KINNEY CALVIN L [US], et al); | [X]US6636580 (MURAKAMI KAZUO [JP], et al) | Examination | US4367196 | US5064607 | US6636580 |