EP1912927 - PROCESS FOR REMOVAL OF BENZOIC ACID FROM AN OXIDIZER PURGE STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUPO PETROTEMEX, S.A. DE C.V. Ricardo Margain No. 444 Torre sur, Piso 16 Col. Valle de Campestre San Pedro Garza Garcia, Nuevo Leon 66265 / MX | [2013/40] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states Grupo Petrotemex, S.A. de C.V. Ricardo Margain No. 444 Torre sur, Piso 16 Col. Valle del Campestre 66265 San Pedro Garza Garcia, Nuevo Leon / MX | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Robert 4533 Palomino Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 02 /
GIBSON, Philip, Edward 2244 Charsley Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | 03 /
PARKER, Kenny, Randolph 599 Tyne Gray Road Afton, TN 37616 / US | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Tostmann, Holger Carl, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06788703.4 | 27.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US29267 | Priority number, date | US20050201512 | 11.08.2005 Original published format: US 201512 | US20050201799 | 11.08.2005 Original published format: US 201799 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007021487 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1912927 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1912927 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/44, C07C63/26, C07C51/47 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C07C51/44 (EP,KR);
C07C51/47 (EP,KR);
C07C63/06 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/44, C07C63/26 (EP);
C07C51/47, C07C63/26 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON BENZOESÄURE AUS EINEM OXIDIZER-REINIGUNGSSTROM | [2008/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR REMOVAL OF BENZOIC ACID FROM AN OXIDIZER PURGE STREAM | [2008/17] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION D'ACIDE BENZOIQUE PROVENANT D'UN FLUX DE PURGE D'UN OXYDANT | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2006 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | IS | 17.12.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.07.2006 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.07.2006 | |
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
SE | 17.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB892766 (STANDARD OIL CO) [X] 1-16 * example 1 *; | [A]WO9730963 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,6,12* page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 15 * |