EP1941763 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING LOCALIZED ELECTRONIC FEEDS IN A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNKO, Gregory 103 Mixedwood Court Cary, NC 27511 / US | 02 /
EAST, Allen, Michael 207 Marvista Court Cary, NC 27511 / US | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06789254.7 | 03.08.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US30197 | Priority number, date | US20050260792 | 27.10.2005 Original published format: US 260792 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007050177 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1941763 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1941763 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
G06F16/9537 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/41] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERHALTEN LOKALISIERTER ELEKTRONISCHER FEEDS IN EINEM MOBILEN GERÄT | [2008/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING LOCALIZED ELECTRONIC FEEDS IN A MOBILE DEVICE | [2008/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES FILS DE SYNDICATION ELECTRONIQUES DANS UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002147790 (SNOW ANDREW J [US]) [A] 1-26* paragraphs [0006] - [0013] - [0019] - [0022] - [0027]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO02087194 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 3,16,26 * page 1, line 32 - page 3, line 21 * * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 2 *; | [YA]EP1276343 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 5-7,18-20 * paragraph [0061]; claims 5,6 * [A] 1-4,8-17,21-26; | [XY]US2005188078 (KOTZIN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-15,17,21-25 * paragraphs [0023] - [0028] - [0034] , [0037] - [0044] - [0052] - [0054] - [0068] - [0071]; figures 1,2,4,9; claims 6-9 * [Y] 3,5-7,16,18-20,26 |