|
30.03.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
09.08.2018 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.04.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Request for further processing allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
13 |