27.03.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
19.04.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
16.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.04.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.12.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2018 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
04.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
04.08.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
03.08.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.07.2018 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
22.06.2018 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.06.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.06.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.06.2018 |
Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
22.06.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
22.06.2018 |
Deletion: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
22.06.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
22.06.2018 |
Deletion: Decision on request for further processing |
|
21.05.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.05.2018 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.05.2018 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.02.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.10.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2017 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
18.04.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.01.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.11.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.11.2016 |
First examination report |
|
02.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
04.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
04.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
05.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
06.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.12.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
24.10.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
23.10.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
04.07.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
04.07.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
27.06.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
11.04.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
27.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|