EP1920382 - IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREW, David Todd c/o Bank of America Corporation NC1-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte NC 28255 / US | 02 /
CALMAN, Matthew A. C/o Bank of America Corporation NC1-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | 03 /
FELSE, Mark David c/o Bank of America Corporation NC1-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | 04 /
CANTLEY, Kerry c/o Bank of America Corporation NC1-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte NC 28255 / US | [2009/28] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
FREW, David Todd 4096 Bamborough Drive Fort Mill, South Carolina 29715 / US | ||
02 /
CALMAN, Matthew A. South Tryon Street, 101 Charlotte, North Carolina 28255 / US | |||
03 /
FELSE, Mark David 8125 Wilburn Court Charlotte, North Carolina 28277 / US | |||
04 /
CANTLEY, Kerry 121 Spring Branch Road Fort Mill, South Carolina 29715 / US | |||
Former [2008/20] | 01 /
FREW, David Todd 4096 Bamborough Drive Fort Mill, South Carolina 29715 / US | ||
02 /
CALMAN, Matthew A. 1105 Hansier Lane Waxhaw, North Carolina 28173 / US | |||
03 /
FELSE, Mark David 8125 Wilburn Court Charlotte, North Carolina 28277 / US | |||
04 /
CANTLEY, Kerry 121 Spring Branch Road Fort Mill, South Carolina 29715 / US | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06789394.1 | 04.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006US30422 | Priority number, date | US20050161475 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: US 161475 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007019300 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1920382 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06Q40/00 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
G06Q20/0425 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06V10/993 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2008/20] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2008/20] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 11.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 31.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0671696 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US6351553 (HAYOSH THOMAS DAVID [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [XP]US2005213805 (BLAKE JAMES A [US], et al) [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5687250 (CURLEY CRAIG DENNIS [US], et al); | [Y]US2002152164 (DUTTA RABINDRANATH [US], et al); | [Y]US2004109596 (DORAN WAYNE M [CA]); | [Y]US2005097046 (SINGFIELD JOY S [US]) |