EP1913522 - ADAPTIVE CODING AND DECODING OF WIDE-RANGE COEFFICIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRINIVASAN, Sridhar One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Goddar, Heinz J. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06789462.6 | 03.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US30566 | Priority number, date | US20050203010 | 12.08.2005 Original published format: US 203010 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007021616 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1913522 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/36, G06T9/00, H04N7/26, H03M7/40 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
H03M7/40 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (KR);
H04N19/13 (KR);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
H04N19/184 (EP,US);
H04N19/187 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | G06K9/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG VON KOEFFIZIENTEN IN EINEM GROSSEN BEREICH | [2008/17] | English: | ADAPTIVE CODING AND DECODING OF WIDE-RANGE COEFFICIENTS | [2008/17] | French: | CODAGE ET DECODAGE ADAPTATIFS DE COEFFICIENTS A LARGE PLAGE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 23.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/22] | 18.04.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/22] | Appeal following examination | 21.02.2018 | Appeal received No. T1019/18 | 18.04.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4744085 (FUKATSU TSUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figure 8 * * column 1, lines 10-20 * * column 2, lines 25-35 * * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 49 *; | [IA]US4749983 (LANGDON JR GLEN G [US]) [I] 1,2 * figure 6 * * column 1, lines 5-8 * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 21 * * column 4, line 1 - column 7, line 14 * [A] 3-6; | [XA]WO9821830 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, lines 5-14 * * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 14 * * page 8, lines 19-34 * [A] 3-6; | [XA]WO0211454 (SILICON GRAPHICS INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, lines 4-31 * * page 11, line 17 - page 14, line 21 * * figures 7-11 * [A] 4-6; | [X] - MARCELO J WEINBERGER ET AL, "The LOCO-I Lossless Image Compression Algorithm: Principles and Standardization into JPEG-LS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (20000801), vol. 9, no. 8, doi:10.1109/83.855427, ISSN 1057-7149, XP011025643 [X] 1-6 * page 1311, section II.B * * pages 1314-1316, section III.C * * pages 1319-1320, section V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/83.855427 | [XA] - MEMON N, "Adaptive coding of DCT coefficients by Golomb-Rice codes", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (19981004), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ICIP.1998.723551, ISBN 978-0-8186-8821-8, pages 516 - 520, XP010308805 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * pages 516-517, sections 1-3 * * pages 518-519, section 4 * [A] 3-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1998.723551 | [XA] - STEARNS S D, "ARITHMETIC CODING IN LOSSLESS WAVEFORM COMPRESSION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (19950801), vol. 43, no. 8, doi:10.1109/78.403346, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 1874 - 1879, XP000526096 [X] 1,2 * pages 1875-1876, section IV * * pages 1877-1878, sections VI-VII * [A] 3-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.403346 | [XA] - A. SAID AND W.A. PEARLMAN, "Low-complexity waveform coding via alphabet and sample-set partitioning", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (199702), vol. 3024, no. 1, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 25 - 37, XP002636780 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-6 | [XA] - CHANG S G ET AL, "A simple block-based lossless image compression scheme", ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, (19961103), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ACSSC.1996.601093, ISBN 978-0-8186-7646-8, pages 591 - 595, XP010231497 [X] 1,2 * pages 591-593, sections 1.2-2.2 * [A] 3-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1996.601093 | [A] - TODD S ET AL, "PARAMETER REDUCTION AND CONTEXT SELECTION FOR COMPRESSION OF GRAY-SCALE IMAGES", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHOTOGRAPHY, TIMOTHY BENN PUBLISHING, LONDON, GB, (19850301), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 0007-1196, pages 188 - 193, XP000563279 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5109451 (AONO TOMOKO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5825979 (TSUTSUI KYOYA [JP], et al); | [Y]US6650784 (THYAGARAJAN KADAYAM [US]); | [Y]US2004114810 (BOLIEK MARTIN [US], et al); | [Y] - CHIANG ET AL., "A Radix-2 Non-Restoring 32-b/32-b Ring Divider with Asychronous Control Scheme", TAMKANG JOURNAL OF SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, vol. 2, no. 1, (1999), pages 37 - 43, URL: http:/www2.tku.edu.tw/-tkjse/2-1/2-1-5-pdf, XP008126079 | Examination | WO0191454 | - COSTA M H M ET AL, "Efficient Run-length Encoding of Binary Sources with Unknown Statistics", INTERNET CITATION, (20031219), URL: http://research.microsoft.com/research/pubs/view.aspx?tr_id=699, (20050106), XP002363735 | by applicant | WO0211454 |