EP1913384 - METHOD FOR DISTINGUISHING ELECTROCHEMICAL SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare, LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Daniel, V. 1720 Lawndale Road Elkhart, Indiana 46514 / US | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Linhart, Angela Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing Building Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Linhart, Angela Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing Building Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06789480.8 | 04.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US30626 | Priority number, date | US20050705903P | 05.08.2005 Original published format: US 705903 P | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007019395 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913384 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913384 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49, C12Q1/00, G01N27/416, G01N33/543 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
G01N27/3273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSCHEIDUNG ELEKTROCHEMISCHER SENSOREN | [2008/17] | English: | METHOD FOR DISTINGUISHING ELECTROCHEMICAL SENSORS | [2008/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE DISTINCTION DE DETECTEURS ELECTROCHIMIQUES | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09011998.3 / EP2138843 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.2009 | BE | 28.10.2009 | CY | 28.10.2009 | CZ | 28.10.2009 | DK | 28.10.2009 | EE | 28.10.2009 | FI | 28.10.2009 | LT | 28.10.2009 | LV | 28.10.2009 | NL | 28.10.2009 | PL | 28.10.2009 | RO | 28.10.2009 | SE | 28.10.2009 | SI | 28.10.2009 | SK | 28.10.2009 | TR | 28.10.2009 | BG | 28.01.2010 | GR | 29.01.2010 | IS | 28.02.2010 | PT | 01.03.2010 | HU | 29.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
NL | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9613707 (CONNOLLY JAMES [US]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2296332 (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [XA]WO03091717 (HOME DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [X] 18,21 * page 7, line 8 - page 9, line 12 * * page 24, line 20 - page 31, line 10 * * figures 16-19; claims 25,39-41,51 * [A] 1-17; | [A]EP1447452 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US]) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0018] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0033] * * figure 3 * |