EP1912902 - TREATMENT OF RECREATIONAL WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lanxess Corporation 111, RIDC Park West Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15275-1112 / US | [2017/02] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states The Chemours Company FC, LLC 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUFANO, Thomas, Peter 2206 Beaumont Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | 02 /
MORKEN, Peter, Arnold 6 Weilers Bend Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [2016/39] |
Former [2013/29] | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06789510.2 | 07.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US30708 | Priority number, date | US20050200422 | 09.08.2005 Original published format: US 200422 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007021641 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912902 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1912902 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/72, C02F103/42, C02F1/66 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C02F1/722 (EP,US);
C02F1/66 (EP,US);
C02F2103/42 (EP,US);
C02F2305/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2016/39] |
Former [2008/25] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON DER ERHOLUNG DIENENDEM WASSER | [2008/17] | English: | TREATMENT OF RECREATIONAL WATER | [2008/17] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU DE LOISIRS | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 12.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US6727219 (BUCKLAND RAYMOND [CA], et al) [DY] 1-10 * example - *; | [Y]US4747976 (YANG CHIHAE [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claim 1 * |