EP1937225 - COATED SUBSTRATE WITH PROPERTIES OF KERATINOUS TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/49] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELCHER, William, Randal 2048 S. Belleview Drive Bellbrook, Ohio 45305 / US | 02 /
CLAPP, Mannie, Lee 8407 Patrilla Lane 45249 / US | 03 /
DATTA, Saswati 11636 Plumhill Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45249 / US | 04 /
EL-NOKALY, Magda 2357 Bedford Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US | 05 /
MURAWSKI, Sandra, Lou 14 Springbok Drive Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | 06 /
PAGE, Steven, Hardy 1030 Seldom Seen Drive Lawrenceburg, Indiana 47025 / US | 07 /
PALDEY, Sohini 11651 Norbourne Drive Apt. 201 Cincinnati, Ohio 45240 / US | 08 /
WARNER, Ronald, Ray 7474 Greenfarms Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45224 / US | 09 /
WARREN, Raphael 6715 West Farmacres Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45237 / US | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2016/49] |
Former [2013/11] | Engisch, Gautier NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2012/12] | Simpson, Kirsty Mairi Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2009/50] | Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centre Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06789663.9 | 10.08.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006US31204 | Priority number, date | US20050707583P | 12.08.2005 Original published format: US 707583 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007021844 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1937225 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937225 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/00, A61K9/70 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
C08J7/065 (EP,US);
A61L27/28 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
A61L2400/18 (EP,US);
C08J2375/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | A61K9/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/49] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETES SUBSTRAT MIT KERATINGEWEBEEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2008/27] | English: | COATED SUBSTRATE WITH PROPERTIES OF KERATINOUS TISSUE | [2008/27] | French: | SUBSTRAT REVÊTU DES PROPRIÉTÉS D'UN TISSU KÉRATINIQUE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 26.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 26.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 23.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2006 | AT | 07.12.2016 | BE | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | ES | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | IT | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | IE | 10.08.2017 | LU | 10.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.08.2006 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.08.2017 | ||
LU | 10.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.08.2006 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.08.2017 | ||
LU | 10.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.08.2017 | ||
LU | 10.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5727567 (CARNABY ANN J [US], et al) [X] 1-13* figures 1-4; claims 1-3,6,9,10 *; | [X]US5804318 (PINCHUK LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * figures 1-4; examples 1-9; claims 1-3,8,9 *; | [X]US2004191504 (STEVENSON JANICE P [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * examples 1-8,10; claims 1-7,16-18 *; | [XP]EP1586674 (TNO [NL], et al) [XP] 1-13 * figures 2-5; example 1; claims 1,15,16,23,24 * | International search | [X]US5727567 (CARNABY ANN J [US], et al) | by applicant | - FOWKES, F. M., INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, (1964), vol. 56, no. 12, page 40 |