EP1913339 - CATIONIC INK FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Markem-Imaje Corporation 150 Congress Street Keene, NH 03431 / US | [2010/24] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states MARKEM CORPORATION 150 Congress Street Keene, New Hampshire 03431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, James M. 11 Newbury Lane Keene, NH 03431 / US | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Lucking, David John Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Lucking, David John FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06789697.7 | 11.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US31351 | Priority number, date | US20050707898P | 12.08.2005 Original published format: US 707898 P | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007021917 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1913339 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913339 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01D11/00, B41J2/02, B41M7/00, G03F7/004 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
B41J11/00212 (EP,US);
B41J11/00214 (EP,US);
B41M5/0023 (EP,US);
B41M5/0047 (EP,US);
B41M5/007 (EP,US);
B41M7/0081 (EP,US);
C08G59/3254 (EP,US);
C08G65/18 (EP,US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/30 (EP,US);
G03F7/038 (EP,US);
G03F7/0755 (EP,US);
H05K1/0266 (EP,US);
H05K2203/013 (EP,US);
H05K2203/122 (EP,US);
H05K2203/161 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | G01D11/00, B41J2/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/37] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KATIONISCHE FARBSTOFFFORMULIERUNGEN | [2008/17] | English: | CATIONIC INK FORMULATIONS | [2008/17] | French: | ENCRES CATIONIQUES | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | [2017/41] |
Former [2017/04] | IT | 11.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02064689 (SOLUTIA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * claims 1-40 *; | [X]EP0993495 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,8,10,12 * claims 1-9 ** page 5, line 15 - line 31 *; | [E]EP1705229 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,3-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0117] * * compounds A-6,A-8 * | International search | [Y]US5623001 (FIGOV MURRAY [IL]); | [X]US6232361 (LAKSIN MIKHAIL [US], et al) | by applicant | US5389133 | WO02064689 | US2005195265 | EP1705229 |