EP1928863 - PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING LECOZTAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHOSH, Krishnendu 11 Hagan Court Sparkill, NY 10976 / US | 02 /
NAGI, Arwinder, S. 9 Locust Drive Thiells, NY 10984 / US | 03 /
PAN, Xiaohong 1480 Rt. 46, Apt. 92B Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 04 /
LIN, Melissa 69 Towsend Road Wanaque, NY 07465 / US | 05 /
LINBERG, Leonid 366 Lake Street Upper Saddle River, New Jersey 07458 / US | 06 /
CAI, Ping One Christie Drive New City, NY 10956 / US | 07 /
BROWNE, Eric N. C.. 4141 Edward Higgins Street Pierrefonds, Québec / CA | 08 /
BERNATCHEZ, Michel 3990 Gouin Boulevard East Montréal, Quebec, H1H 1C6 / CA | 09 /
LANKAU, Mark 134 Sunnyside Street Dollard Des Ormeaux, Québec H9A 1V9 / CA | 10 /
RAJE, Sangeeta 2703 Baldeagle Circle Audubon, PA 19403 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
GHOSH, Krishnendu 11 Hagan Court Sparkill, NY 10976 / US | ||
02 /
NAGI, Arwinder, S. 9 Locust Drive Thiells, NY 10984 / US | |||
03 /
PAN, Xiaohong 22 RoseLawn Road Highland Mills, New York 10930 / US | |||
04 /
LIN, Melissa 69 Towsend Road Wanaque, NY 07465 / US | |||
05 /
LINBERG, Leonid 366 Lake Street Upper Saddle River, New Jersey 07458 / US | |||
06 /
CAI, Ping One Christie Drive New City, NY 10956 / US | |||
07 /
BROWNE, Eric N. C.. 4141 Edward Higgins Street Pierrefonds, Québec / CA | |||
08 /
BERNATCHEZ, Michel 3990 Gouin Boulevard East Montréal, Quebec, H1H 1C6 / CA | |||
09 /
LANKAU, Mark 134 Sunnyside Street Dollard Des Ormeaux, Québec H9A 1V9 / CA | |||
10 /
RAJE, Sangeeta 2703 Baldeagle Circle Audubon, PA 19403 / US | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/32] |
Former [2010/32] | Summers, Victoria Clare, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Talbott, Dawn Jacqueline Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06790193.4 | 06.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006US34813 | Priority number, date | US20050715417P | 09.09.2005 Original published format: US 715417 P | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007030589 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1928863 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, C07D405/14, A61K31/44, C07D213/75, A61K9/00, A61K9/20 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
A61K9/286 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP,KR);
A61K31/496 (KR);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61K9/2054 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE DOSIERUNGSFORMEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE LECOZTAN ENTHALTEN | [2008/24] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING LECOZTAN | [2008/24] | French: | FORMES DOSIFIEES PHARMACEUTIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS ASSOCIEES | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/40] | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0226214 (SOLVAY PHARM BV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-68 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005044222 (CIPLA LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-68 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005092307 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [PX] 57 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2006093853 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-68* the whole document *; | [Y] - CHILDERS W E ET AL, "Synthesis and Biological Evaluation of Benzodioxanylpiperazine Derivatives as Potent Serotonin 5-HT1A Antagonists: The Discovery of Lecozotan", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (20050416), vol. 48, no. 10, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3467 - 3470, XP002391411 [Y] 1-68 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm049493z | [A] - HADDJERI NASSER ET AL, "Effect of sustained administration of the 5-HT1A receptor agonist flesinoxan on rat 5-HT neurotransmission", EUROPEAN NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (199909), vol. 9, no. 5, ISSN 0924-977X, pages 427 - 440, XP002448046 [A] 1-68 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-977X(99)00020-6 | [A] - FORSTER E A ET AL, "A PHARMACOLOGICAL PROFILE OF THE SELECTIVE SILENT 5-HT1A RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST, WAY-100635", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1995), vol. 281, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 81 - 88, XP000604092 [A] 1-68 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(95)00234-C | [PX] - PATAT ET AL, "PI-34", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, ST LOUIS, MO, US, (200602), vol. 79, no. 2, ISSN 0009-9236, page P16, XP005361172 [PX] 1-68 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clpt.2005.12.055 | [DPX] - SCHECHTER L E ET AL, "Lecozotan (SRA-333): A selective serotonin 1A receptor antagonist that enhances the stimulated release of glutamate and acetylcholine in the hippocampus and possesses cognitive-enhancing properties", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (200509), vol. 314, no. 3, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 1274 - 1289 URL, XP002448048 [DPX] 1-68 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.105.086363 | [PY] - CHILDERS W.E. ET. AL., "Lecozotan Hydrochloride", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (2007), vol. 32, no. 5, pages 399 - 407, XP002448050 [PY] 1-68 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2007.032.05.1092901 |