EP1817293 - DIASTEREOMERIC PURIFICATION OF ROSUVASTATIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIDDAM-HILDESHEIM, Valerie P.O. Box 3984 60920 Kadima / IL | 02 /
SHENKAR, Natalia 11/1 Hashofet Brandes Street Petach Tiqva / IL | 03 /
CHEN, Kobi 21 Beit Hilel Str. 47291 Ramat Hasharon / IL | 04 /
BALANOV, Anna Keselman 3/7 76573 Rehovot / IL | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/33] | 01 /
NIDDAM-HILDESHEIM, Valerie P.O. Box 21 40696 Ein Vered / IL | ||
02 /
SHENKAR, Natalia 11/1 Hashofet Brandes Street Petach Tiqva / IL | |||
03 /
CHEN, Kobi 21 Beit Hilel Str. 47291 Ramat Hasharon / IL | |||
04 /
BALANOV, Anna Keselman 3/7 76573 Rehovot / IL | Representative(s) | Wong, Kit Yee, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | Wong, Kit Yee, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06790220.5 | 12.09.2006 | [2007/33] | WO2006US35711 | Priority number, date | US20050723491P | 03.10.2005 Original published format: US 723491 P | US20050732979P | 02.11.2005 Original published format: US 732979 P | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007040940 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1817293 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/42 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
C07D239/42 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/78 (KR);
A61P3/06 (EP);
C07D213/76 (EP,KR,US);
C07B2200/07 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIASTEREOMERE REINIGUNG VON ROSUVASTATIN | [2007/33] | English: | DIASTEREOMERIC PURIFICATION OF ROSUVASTATIN | [2007/33] | French: | PURIFICATION DIASTEREOMERIQUE DE LA ROSUVASTATINE | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDA]USRE37314E (HIRAI KENTARO [JP], et al) [XD] 39,41,73 * column 10 - column 11; example 1 * * example 1 * [A] 1,47,64; | [XA]WO03087112 (CLS LAB INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,73 * page 19 * [A] 5,7,39,41; | [XA]WO03097614 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-38,71 * page 8; sequence II * * page 12 - page 14; example 2 * [A] 39,41,73; | [XD]US2005080134 (NIDDAM-HILDESHEIM VALERIE [IL], et al) [XD] 72* claims 1-39 * |