EP1942894 - PREPARATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIARRHOEA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colocaps Pty Ltd 212, 25 McCourt Street, St John of God Health Subiaco, WA 6008 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Colocaps Pty Ltd 212, 25 McCourt Street, St John of God Health Subiaco, WA 6008 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVITT, Michael, David 44 Churchill Avenue Subiaco, Western Australia 6008 / AU | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06790339.3 | 06.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006AU01469 | Priority number, date | AU20050905533 | 07.10.2005 Original published format: AU 2005905533 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007041772 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942894 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/451, A61K31/717, A61K31/74, A61K31/785, A61P1/12 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/451 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/717 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/74 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/785 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/451, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/717, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/74, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/785, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIARRHÖE | [2008/29] | English: | PREPARATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIARRHOEA | [2008/29] | French: | PRÉPARATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DIARRHÉE | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 27.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2010 | 31.10.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0296526 ; | [X]JPH05117149 ; | [X]BE896241 (PROSAN INTERNAT) [X] 1-24 * page 3, paragraphs 1-3 * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]WO9404136 (DAY CHARLES E [US]) [X] 1-24 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 6, line 30 - page 10, line 13 * * pages 12,13; example 1 * * page 17, lines 8-23 ** claims 1-9 *; | [X]WO0180822 (ETHYPHARM SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-24 * pages 29,30; example 2 *; | [X]WO2005055934 (GANEDEN BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * page 2, lines 1-31 * * page 22; example 5 * * claims 47-52 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 20, Database accession no. 1990-151818, XP002615291 & JPH0296526 A 19900409 (DAINIPPON PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1-24 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 24, Database accession no. 1993-191433, XP002615292 & JPH05117149 A 19930514 (OHTA SEIYAKU KK) [X] 1-24 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2003124088 (MASUDA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0323666 ; | [X]WO9211019 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | [X] - JACOBSEN O. ET AL, "Effect of enterocoated cholestyramine on bowel habit after ileal resection: a double blind crossover study", BRITISH MEDICAL JOURNAL, (19850504), vol. 290, pages 1315 - 1318, XP003011773 | [X] - TURLEY S.D. ET AL, "Effect of feeding psyllium and cholestyramine in combination on low density lipoprotein metabolism and fecal bile acid excretion in hamsters with dietary-induced hypercholesterolemia.", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 27, pages 71 - 79, XP008126006 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005344-199601000-00012 | [X] - DAGGY B.P. ET AL, "Additive hypocholesterolemic effect of psyllium and cholestyramine in the hamster: influence on fecal sterol and bile acid profiles", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 491 - 502, XP003011774 |